EP3574830 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR BLOOD GLUCOSE LEVEL MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2020/16] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | ||
Former [2019/49] | For all designated states SONY MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS INC. 4-12-3 Higashi-Shinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RASMUSSON, Jim Jordholmsvägen 247 235 41 Lund / SE | 02 /
KARLSSON, Peter C. Blåbärsstigen 7 227 38 Lund / SE | 03 /
SVENSSON, Magnus Fullriggaregatan 12 234 42 Lomma / SE | 04 /
NILSSON, Claes Lervägen 10 227 30 Lund / SE | 05 /
EKLUND, Jimmy Sony Mobile Communicationns Mobilvägen 221 88 Lund / SE | [2023/37] |
Former [2019/49] | 01 /
Rasmusson, Jim Jordholmsvägen 247 235 41 Lund / SE | ||
02 /
Karlsson, Peter C Blåbärsstigen 7 227 38 Lund / SE | |||
03 /
Svensson, Magnus Fullriggaregatan 12 SE-234 42 Lomma / SE | |||
04 /
Nilsson, Claes Lervägen 10 SE-227 30 Lund / SE | |||
05 /
Eklund, Jimmy Sony Mobile Communicationns Mobilvägen SE-221 88 Lund / SE | Representative(s) | Neij & Lindberg AB Pedellgatan 11 224 60 Lund / SE | [2019/49] | Application number, filing date | 19171632.3 | 29.04.2019 | [2019/49] | Priority number, date | SE20180050652 | 30.05.2018 Original published format: SE 1850652 | [2019/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3574830 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3574830 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/145, A61B5/00, // G10L17/26 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/4803 (EP,US);
A61B5/681 (US);
A61B5/72 (US);
A61B5/1451 (EP);
A61B5/6822 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] |
Former [2019/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DES BLUTZUCKERSPIEGELS | [2019/49] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR BLOOD GLUCOSE LEVEL MONITORING | [2019/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE DE NIVEAU DE GLUCOSE DANS LE SANG | [2019/49] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 07.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2023 | CZ | 20.12.2023 | EE | 20.12.2023 | ES | 20.12.2023 | FI | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | IT | 20.12.2023 | LT | 20.12.2023 | LV | 20.12.2023 | NL | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SE | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | BG | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | PT | 22.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 20.12.2023 | |
CZ | 20.12.2023 | ||
EE | 20.12.2023 | ||
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 20.12.2023 | |
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003125612 (FOX JAMES KELLY [US], et al) [Y] 8,9 * paragraph [0089] * * figures 4, 5 *; | [A]US7398213 (LEVANON YORAM [IL], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 7, 8 *; | [XYI]WO2014072823 (SCIENMET LA INC [RU]) [X] 1,2,7,10,12-15 * page 5, lines 23-28 * * page 6, lines 24-30 * * page 7, line 11 - page 8, lines 12, 21-30 * [Y] 8,9 [I] 3-6,11; | [A]DE102015218948 (BRANDENBURGISCHE TECHNISCHE UNIVERSITÄT COTTBUS-SENFTENBERG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * |