EP3575548 - SONDE WITH INTEGRAL PRESSURE SENSOR AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merlin Technology Inc. 19625 62nd Avenue South Suite B-103 Kent, WA 98032 / US | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAU, Albert W. 18721 N.E. 133rd Street Woodinville, WA 98072 / US | 02 /
FELDMAN, Dmitry 4130 NE 96th Seattle, WA 98115 / US | 03 /
MEDEIROS, Benjamin John 307 Nelsen St. N.E. Orting, WA 98360 / US | [2023/37] |
Former [2019/49] | 01 /
CHAU, Albert W. 18721 N.E. 133rd Street Woodinville, WA Washington 98072 / US | ||
02 /
FELDMAN, Dmitry 4130 NE 96th Seattle, WA Washington 98115 / US | |||
03 /
MEDEIROS, Benjamin John 307 Nelsen St. N.E. Orting, WA Washington 98360 / US | Representative(s) | Lusinchi, Laurent Pierre, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [2019/49] | Application number, filing date | 19171790.9 | 17.02.2012 | [2019/49] | Priority number, date | US201113071302 | 24.03.2011 Original published format: US201113071302 | [2019/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3575548 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3575548 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3575548 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01L19/14, H05K13/00, E21B47/06, E21B47/017 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
E21B47/06 (EP,RU,US);
E21B47/01 (RU);
E21B47/017 (EP,RU,US);
G01L19/14 (EP);
Y10T29/49002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/42] | H05K13/00, E21B47/06, E21B47/017 | ||
Former IPC [2019/49] | E21B47/01, E21B17/10, H05K13/00, E21B47/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] | Title | German: | SONDE MIT INTEGRALEM DRUCKSENSOR UND VERFAHREN | [2019/49] | English: | SONDE WITH INTEGRAL PRESSURE SENSOR AND METHOD | [2019/49] | French: | SONDE DOTÉE D'UN CAPTEUR DE PRESSION INTÉGRAL ET PROCÉDÉ | [2019/49] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 06.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12761392.5 / EP2689103 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 13.09.2023 | |
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 13.09.2023 | |
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 13.12.2023 | |
GR | 14.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0123704 (IN SITU INC [US]); | [X]US2005056415 (ZILLINGER FRED [CA]) | Examination | GB2237646 | US6282966 | by applicant | US6223826 | US6655464 | US6845822 |