EP3572637 - GAS TURBINE ENGINE COUPLING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | [2021/22] |
Former [2020/09] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | ||
Former [2019/48] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 62 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Swift, Andrew c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | 02 /
Thornton, Stewart c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Moor Lane (ML-9) PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/48] | Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept SinA-48 PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19171890.7 | 30.04.2019 | [2019/48] | Priority number, date | GB20180008544 | 24.05.2018 Original published format: GB 201808544 | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3572637 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3572637 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F02C3/107, F01D25/24, F02K3/06, F01D21/04, F01D5/02 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
F01D5/026 (EP);
F02C7/32 (US);
F01D21/04 (EP);
F02C3/107 (EP);
F02C7/36 (EP,CN);
F02K3/06 (EP,US);
F16D1/033 (EP);
F16D9/04 (EP,CN);
F16H57/021 (US);
F16H57/023 (US);
F05D2260/30 (US);
F05D2260/311 (EP);
F05D2260/40311 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] |
Former [2019/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GASTURBINENMOTORKUPPLUNGSANORDNUNG | [2019/48] | English: | GAS TURBINE ENGINE COUPLING ARRANGEMENT | [2019/48] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE COUPLAGE DE TURBINE À GAZ | [2019/48] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 20.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2019 | AL | 02.06.2021 | AT | 02.06.2021 | CY | 02.06.2021 | CZ | 02.06.2021 | DK | 02.06.2021 | EE | 02.06.2021 | ES | 02.06.2021 | FI | 02.06.2021 | HR | 02.06.2021 | IT | 02.06.2021 | LT | 02.06.2021 | LV | 02.06.2021 | MC | 02.06.2021 | MK | 02.06.2021 | NL | 02.06.2021 | PL | 02.06.2021 | RO | 02.06.2021 | RS | 02.06.2021 | SE | 02.06.2021 | SI | 02.06.2021 | SK | 02.06.2021 | SM | 02.06.2021 | TR | 02.06.2021 | BG | 02.09.2021 | NO | 02.09.2021 | GR | 03.09.2021 | IS | 02.10.2021 | PT | 04.10.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 30.04.2019 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CY | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
MK | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 30.04.2019 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CY | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 30.04.2019 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3341141 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) [A] 1-15* page 8, line 10 - line 29; figure 2a *; | [A]US2014348577 (COFFIN JAMES B [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0016]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2016298492 (SMITH DARREN M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024]; figures 2A,2B * | by applicant | EP3121469 |