EP3543207 - WESTERN BLOT ANALYSIS USING POLYMER DOTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Washington through its Center for Commercialization 4311 11th Avenue NE Suite 500 Seattle, WA 98105-4608 / US | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIU, Daniel T 7009 40th Avenue N.E. Seattle, WA 98115 / US | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/39] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19171956.6 | 05.03.2014 | [2019/39] | Priority number, date | US201361773044P | 05.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361773044 P | [2019/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3543207 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B82B1/00, B82B3/00, B82Y40/00, B82Y15/00, G01N33/68, G01N33/58 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
G01N33/588 (EP,US);
G01N33/6803 (EP,US);
B82Y15/00 (US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
G01N2458/30 (EP,US);
Y10S977/774 (EP,US);
Y10S977/92 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] |
Former [2019/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WESTERN-BLOT-ANALYSE UNTER VERWENDUNG VON POLYMERPUNKTEN | [2019/39] | English: | WESTERN BLOT ANALYSIS USING POLYMER DOTS | [2019/39] | French: | TRANSFERT DE TYPE WESTERN UTILISANT DES POINTS POLYMÈRES | [2019/39] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 11.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14761091.9 / EP2964565 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2011057295 (UNIV WASHINGTON CT COMMERCIALIZATION [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 24, 42, 61, 65 *; | [I]WO2012054525 (UNIV WASHINGTON CT COMMERCIALIZATION [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0066] - [0069] * * paragraphs [0008] - [0018] - [0 28] - [0041] - [0 73] - [0076] - [ 121] - [0136]; examples 8, 10 *; | [I]WO2012083235 (BIO RAD LABORATORIES [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 20, paragraph 83; claim 31 *; | [Y]WO2012122302 (UNIV OREGON HEALTH & SCIENCE [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [T]WO2014153051 (UNIV WASHINGTON CT COMMERCIALI [US]) [T] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [T]WO2015006714 (UNIV WASHINGTON CT COMMERCIALI [US]) [T] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I] - CHANGFENG WU ET AL, "Ultrabright and Bioorthogonal Labeling of Cellular Targets Using Semiconducting Polymer Dots and Click Chemistry", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (20101203), vol. 49, no. 49, doi:10.1002/anie.201004260, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 9436 - 9440, XP055077711 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201004260 | [Y] - YU RONG ET AL, "Multicolor Fluorescent Semiconducting Polymer Dots with Narrow Emissions and High Brightness", ACS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20130101), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.1021/NN304376Z, ISSN 1936-0851, pages 376 - 384, XP008180208 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nn304376z | [XP] - F. YE ET AL, "Ultrasensitive Detection of Proteins on Western Blots with Semiconducting Polymer Dots", MACROMOLECULAR RAPID COMMUNICATIONS, Weinheim, (20130514), vol. 34, no. 9, doi:10.1002/marc.201200809, ISSN 1022-1336, pages 785 - 790, XP055291132 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/marc.201200809 | [T] - F. Ye et al., Chapter 14, "Ultrasensitive Protein Detection on Dot Blots and Western Blots withSemiconducting Polymer Dots.", F. Ye et al., Chapter 14, N.J. Clifton, Ultrasensitive Protein Detection on Dot Blots and Western Blots with Semiconducting Polymer Dots, New York NY USA, Methods in molecular biology: DETECTION OF BLOTTED PROTEINS, SPRINGER NEW YORK, USA, PAGE(S) 131 - 137, (20150101), vol. 1314, pages 131 - 137, ISBN 978-1-4939-2717-3, XP008180941 [T] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-1-4939-2718-0_14 | [T] - FIRER M A, "Efficient elution of functional proteins in affinity chromatography", JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL METHODS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20011030), vol. 49, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/S0165-022X(01)00211-1, ISSN 0165-022X, pages 433 - 442, XP002497544 [T] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-022X(01)00211-1 | by applicant | WO2011057295 | WO2013101902 | - YE, F., Chem. Comm., (20120000), vol. 48, page 1778 |