EP3576011 - CLASSIFICATION SYSTEM AND CLASSIFICATION METHOD OF AUTOANTIBODY IMMUNOFLUORESCENCE IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chang Gung Memorial Hospital, Linkou No.5, Fuxing Street Guishan District Taoyuan City 33305 / TW | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuo, Chang-Fu c/o Chang Gung Memorial Hospital, Linkou No. 5, Fuxing St. Guishan Dist. 33305 Taoyuan City / TW | 02 /
Lin, Chi-Hung c/o Center for Artificial Intelligence in Medicine Chang Gung Memorial Hospital Linkou, No.5, Fuxing Str., Guishan Dist. Taoyuan City 33305 / TW | 03 /
Chen, Yi-Ling 4F., No.185-3, Zhongshan N. Rd. Dayuan Dist. Taoyuan City 337 / TW | 04 /
Chiou, Meng-Jiun c/o Center for Artificial Intelligence in Medicine Chang Gung Memorial Hospital Linkou, No.5, Fuxing Str., Guishan Dist. Taoyuan City 33305 / TW | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/49] | 01 /
Kuo, Chang-Fu c/o Chang Gung Memorial Hospital, Linkou No. 5, Fuxing St. Guishan Dist. 33305 Taoyuan City / TW | ||
02 /
Lin, Chi-Hung c/o Center for Artificial Intelligence in Medicine Chang Gung Memorial Hospital Linkou, No.5, Fuxing Str., Guishan Dist. Taoyuan City 33305 / TW | |||
03 /
Chen, Yi-Ling c/o Chang Gung Memorial Hospital, Linkou No. 5, Fuxing St. Guishan Dist. 33305 Taoyuan City / TW | |||
04 /
Chiou, Meng-Jiun c/o Center for Artificial Intelligence in Medicine Chang Gung Memorial Hospital Linkou, No.5, Fuxing Str., Guishan Dist. Taoyuan City 33305 / TW | Representative(s) | Scholz, Volker Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/49] | Application number, filing date | 19172308.9 | 02.05.2019 | [2019/49] | Priority number, date | TW20180118280 | 29.05.2018 Original published format: TW 107118280 | [2019/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3576011 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/62 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V20/695 (US);
G06V20/698 (EP,CN,US);
G16B5/00 (US);
G06T2207/10064 (US);
G06T2207/20084 (US);
G06T2207/30024 (US);
G06V2201/03 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] |
Former [2019/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLASSIFIZIERUNGSSYSTEM UND KLASSIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR AUTOANTIKÖRPER-IMMUNFLUORESZENZBILD | [2019/49] | English: | CLASSIFICATION SYSTEM AND CLASSIFICATION METHOD OF AUTOANTIBODY IMMUNOFLUORESCENCE IMAGE | [2019/49] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CLASSIFICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE CLASSIFICATION D'IMAGES IMMUNOFLUORESCENTES D'AUTO-ANTICORPS | [2019/49] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 04.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - LI YUEXIANG ET AL, A Deep Residual Inception Network for HEp-2 Cell Classification, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER ANALYSIS OF IMAGES AND PATTERNS. CAIP 2017: COMPUTER ANALYSIS OF IMAGES AND PATTERNS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE; LECT.NOTES COMPUTER], SPRINGER, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 12 - 20, (20170909), ISBN 978-3-642-17318-9, XP047450924 [A] 1-18 * Section 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-319-67558-9_2 |