EP3539439 - FLOOR CLEANING TOOL AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diversey, Inc. 8310 16th Street, M/S 509 P.O. Box 902 Sturtevant, WI 53177-0902 / US | For all designated states Kuzhnini, Josef Othmarstr.20 9500 Wil / CH | [2019/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUZHNINI, Josef Othmarstr. 20 9500 Wil / CH | 02 /
WINDMEISSER, Dieter Hauptstr. 19 8269 Fruthwilen / CH | 03 /
BARTSCH, Andre Konstanzerstrasse 55c 9512 Rossruti / CH | 04 /
AUERSWALD, Jerry Gustav-Schwab-Strasse 14n 78467 Konstanz / DE | 05 /
BAHR, Thomas Eichbuhlstrasse 4 9545 Wangi / CH | 06 /
STAGER, Beat Anetswilerstrasse 19 9545 Wangi / CH | 07 /
JAHDE, Phillip Stationsstrasse 14 8355 Aadorf / CH | [2020/20] |
Former [2019/38] | 01 /
KUZHNINI, Josef Othmarstr. 20 9500 Wil / CH | ||
02 /
WINDMEISSER, Dieter Hauptstr. 19 8269 Fruthwilen / CH | |||
03 /
BARTSCH, Andre Konstanzerstrasse 55c 9512 Rossruti / CH | |||
04 /
AUERSWALD, Jerry Gustav-Schwab-Strasse 14n 78467 Konstanz / DE | |||
05 /
BAHR, Thomas Eichbuhlstrasse 4 9545 Wangi / CH | |||
06 /
STAGER, Beat Anetswilerstrasse 19 9545 Wangi / CH | |||
07 /
JAHDE, Phillip Muhlewiesestrasse 9a 8355 Aadorf / CH | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2019/38] | Application number, filing date | 19172808.8 | 28.04.2011 | [2019/38] | Priority number, date | US201032918410P | 29.04.2010 Original published format: US 32918410 P | [2019/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3539439 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3539439 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3539439 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47L11/40 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
A47L11/302 (EP,US);
A47L9/0455 (US);
A47L11/19 (US);
A47L11/4041 (EP,US);
A47L11/4044 (EP,US);
A47L11/4075 (EP,US);
A47L11/4077 (EP,US);
A47L11/408 (EP);
A47L11/4088 (EP,US);
A47L9/0477 (US);
B05B1/202 (US);
A47L11/18 (US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] |
Former [2019/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BODENREINIGUNGSWERKZEUG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2019/38] | English: | FLOOR CLEANING TOOL AND METHOD | [2019/38] | French: | OUTIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE NETTOYAGE DE SOL | [2019/38] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 17.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11778002.3 / EP2563201 | Divisional application(s) | EP22177273.4 / EP4085813 | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 08.06.2022 | AT | 08.06.2022 | CZ | 08.06.2022 | DK | 08.06.2022 | EE | 08.06.2022 | ES | 08.06.2022 | FI | 08.06.2022 | HR | 08.06.2022 | LT | 08.06.2022 | LV | 08.06.2022 | MC | 08.06.2022 | NL | 08.06.2022 | PL | 08.06.2022 | RO | 08.06.2022 | RS | 08.06.2022 | SE | 08.06.2022 | SI | 08.06.2022 | SK | 08.06.2022 | SM | 08.06.2022 | BG | 08.09.2022 | NO | 08.09.2022 | GR | 09.09.2022 | IS | 08.10.2022 | PT | 10.10.2022 | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/25] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]NL6400665 (G.H. TENNANT COMPANY) [A] 1-5,15 * figure - *; | [A]US5509162 (BURGOON JACK L [US]) [A] 1-5,15 * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 64; figure - *; | [A]WO0178909 (TENNANT CO [US], et al) [A] 1,6-14 * page 9, line 24 - page 11, line 24; figures 1-3,6 *; | [A]US2002050023 (STUCHLIK WILLIAM R [US]) [A] 1,6-14* paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1,12-14B *; | [A]US2002092122 (ZAHURANEC TERRY L [US], et al) [A] 1-5,15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1,3,5-7 *; | [A]EP1595487 (COMAC S P A [IT]) [A] 1,6-14 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE102005045669 (KAERCHER GMBH & CO KG ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1-5,15 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0040]; figure - * |