EP3560405 - DISHWASHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Kyuhyung LG Electronics Inc., IP Center 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
PYO, Joonho LG Electronics Inc., IP Center 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 03 /
HONG, Wook LG Electronics Inc., IP Center 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/44] | Application number, filing date | 19173246.0 | 15.03.2017 | [2019/44] | Priority number, date | KR20160072197 | 10.06.2016 Original published format: KR 20160072197 | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3560405 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/42 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
A47L15/4282 (EP,KR,US);
A47L15/428 (CN,KR);
A47L15/23 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A47L15/22 (EP,KR,US);
A47L15/42 (CN);
A47L15/421 (US);
A47L15/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] |
Former [2019/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GESCHIRRSPÜLER | [2019/44] | English: | DISHWASHER | [2019/44] | French: | LAVE-VAISSELLE | [2019/44] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 29.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17161061.1 / EP3254603 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5415350 (YOON HONG Y [KR], et al) [A] 1-14* figures 3-5 *; | [XA]CN203789884U (MIDEA GROUP CO LTD, et al) [X] 1,2,12,14 * figures 1-5 * [A] 3-11,13; | [A]CN104706293 (FOSHAN SHUNDE MIDEA WASHING APPLIANCES MFG CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]CN104739346 (WUHU MEDIA WASHING APPLIANCES MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | KR20120126598 |