EP3567466 - IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOCERA Document Solutions Inc. 1-2-28, Tamatsukuri Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-8585 / JP | [2019/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIKUCHI, Ryota c/o KYOCERA Document Solutions Inc. 1-2-28, Tamatsukuri, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-8585 / JP | [2019/46] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2019/46] | Application number, filing date | 19173260.1 | 08.05.2019 | [2019/46] | Priority number, date | JP20180091330 | 10.05.2018 Original published format: JP 2018091330 | [2019/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3567466 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12 | [2019/46] | CPC: |
G06F3/1213 (EP);
G06K15/1823 (US);
G03G15/50 (CN);
G03G15/5087 (CN);
G03G15/65 (CN);
G06F3/1204 (US);
G06F3/1205 (US);
G06F3/1215 (US);
G06F3/1247 (EP);
G06F3/1254 (US);
G06F3/126 (US);
G06F3/1285 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] |
Former [2019/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/46] | English: | IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS | [2019/46] | French: | APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'IMAGES | [2019/46] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 12.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/32] | 05.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011255117 (UMEDA YOSHINOBU [JP]) [X] 1-3,5 * figures 3-5 * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0036] * * paragraphs [0041] - [0090] *[I] 4,6,7 |