EP3552784 - MECHANICAL LOCKING SYSTEM FOR FLOOR PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ceraloc Innovation AB Prästavägen 513 263 64 Viken / SE | [2021/27] |
Former [2019/42] | For all designated states Ceraloc Innovation AB Prästavägen 513 263 65 Viken / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERVAN, Darko Bygatan 30 263 61 Viken / SE | [2023/47] |
Former [2019/42] | 01 /
PERVAN, Darko Bygatan 30 SE-263 61 VIKEN / SE | Representative(s) | Välinge Innovation AB Patent Department Prästavägen 513 263 64 Viken / SE | [2024/15] |
Former [2019/42] | Välinge Innovation AB Patent Department Prästavägen 513 263 65 Viken / SE | Application number, filing date | 19173607.3 | 28.08.2012 | [2019/42] | Priority number, date | SE20110050778 | 29.08.2011 Original published format: SE 1150778 | SE20110050803 | 06.09.2011 Original published format: SE 1150803 | [2019/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3552784 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3552784 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B26D1/14, B26D3/06, E04F15/02, E04F15/10, E04F15/18, E04C2/40, B26D1/00, E04C2/38 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
E04F15/02038 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
B26D1/14 (EP,US);
B26D3/06 (EP,US);
E04B1/6125 (KR);
E04C2/38 (US);
E04C2/40 (US);
E04F13/0894 (CN,KR);
E04F15/102 (US);
E04F15/105 (EP);
E04F15/107 (EP,US);
E04F15/18 (US);
B26D2001/0053 (EP,US);
B26D2001/006 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0146 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0153 (EP,KR,US);
E04F2201/021 (EP,US);
E04F2201/03 (CN);
E04F2201/04 (CN);
E04F2201/041 (EP,US);
E04F2201/043 (KR);
E04F2201/0547 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] | Title | German: | MECHANISCHES ARRETIERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR BODENPLATTEN | [2019/42] | English: | MECHANICAL LOCKING SYSTEM FOR FLOOR PANELS | [2019/42] | French: | SYSTÈME DE VERROUILLAGE MÉCANIQUE POUR PANNEAUX DE PLANCHER | [2019/42] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 15.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12826931.3 / EP2751356 | Divisional application(s) | EP24169058.5 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5190799 (ELLINGSON III CHESTER W [US]); | [X]WO2010072357 (PARCOLYS N V [BE], et al); | [XI]ES2350339 (ALAI PLASTICOS SA [ES]) | Examination | JPS62178654 |