EP3575534 - DEVICE FOR SECURING THE LEAF MOVEMENTS OF AN AUTOMATIC REVOLVING DOOR BY MEANS OF A SENSOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Straße 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUCKER, Dr., Matthias Lorenzstr. 20 76359 Marxzell / DE | [2022/10] |
Former [2019/49] | 01 /
Hucker, Dr., Matthias Lorenzstr. 20 76359 Marxzell / DE | Application number, filing date | 19173659.4 | 09.05.2019 | [2019/49] | Priority number, date | DE201810208440 | 29.05.2018 Original published format: DE102018208440 | [2019/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3575534 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3575534 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/42 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
E05F15/42 (EP);
E05F15/40 (CN);
E05F15/73 (CN);
E05F15/611 (EP);
E05F2015/434 (EP);
E05F2015/765 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] |
Former [2019/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR SENSORISCHEN ABSICHERUNG DER FLÜGELBEWEGUNGEN EINER AUTOMATISCHEN DREHTÜR | [2019/49] | English: | DEVICE FOR SECURING THE LEAF MOVEMENTS OF AN AUTOMATIC REVOLVING DOOR BY MEANS OF A SENSOR SYSTEM | [2019/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SÉCURISATION SENSORIELLE DES MOUVEMENTS DE BATTANT D'UNE PORTE TOURNANTE AUTOMATIQUE | [2019/49] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 07.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 22.06.2022 | CZ | 22.06.2022 | DK | 22.06.2022 | EE | 22.06.2022 | ES | 22.06.2022 | FI | 22.06.2022 | HR | 22.06.2022 | IT | 22.06.2022 | LT | 22.06.2022 | LV | 22.06.2022 | MC | 22.06.2022 | NL | 22.06.2022 | RO | 22.06.2022 | RS | 22.06.2022 | SI | 22.06.2022 | SK | 22.06.2022 | SM | 22.06.2022 | BG | 22.09.2022 | NO | 22.09.2022 | GR | 23.09.2022 | IS | 22.10.2022 | PT | 24.10.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/09] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | CZ | 22.06.2022 | |
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 22.06.2022 | |
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 22.06.2022 | |
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP2418517 (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,8-11,15-17,19,20 * paragraphs [0008] , [0015] , [0026] , [0033] , [0041] , [0048] - [0050] - [0089] , [0095] , [0098] - [0100] - [0104] , [0105] , [0109] , [0132] - [0001] * * figures 1,3a-3c,4a-4c * [A] 7[I] 4-6,12-14,18 |