EP3543508 - GAS TURBINE ENGINE WITH INTERCOOLED COOLING AIR AND CONTROLLED BOOST COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
Former [2019/39] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SNAPE, Nathan 520 Mile Hill Road Tolland, CT Connecticut 06084 / US | 02 /
STAUBACH, Joseph Brent 15 Diane Lane Colchester, CT Connecticut 06415 / US | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/39] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 19173910.1 | 04.12.2017 | [2019/39] | Priority number, date | US201615368726 | 05.12.2016 Original published format: US201615368726 | [2019/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3543508 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3543508 | Date: | 18.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F02C7/18, F02C7/36 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
F02C7/185 (EP,US);
F02C7/36 (EP,US);
F02K3/06 (US);
F04D27/002 (US);
F05D2220/323 (US);
F05D2260/213 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] |
Former [2019/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GASTURBINENMOTOR MIT ZWISCHENGEKÜHLTER KÜHLLUFT UND GESTEUERTEM BOOST-VERDICHTER | [2019/39] | English: | GAS TURBINE ENGINE WITH INTERCOOLED COOLING AIR AND CONTROLLED BOOST COMPRESSOR | [2019/39] | French: | MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ À AIR DE REFROIDISSEMENT REFROIDI ET COMPRESSEUR À SURPRESSION RÉGULÉ | [2019/39] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 25.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17205087.4 / EP3330517 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US5452573 (GLICKSTEIN MARVIN R [US], et al); | [A]EP3085924 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]); | [XP]EP3109437 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]); | [E]EP3287623 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]); | [E]EP3318743 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) | Examination | EP3056714 |