EP3738771 - DUAL CURE EPOXY FORMULATIONS FOR 3D PRINTING APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): EE, ES, SK | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/33] |
Former [2020/47] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POELLER, Sascha Friedhofstraße 21 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
ROSSBERG, Tanja Altes Walzwerk 5 a 42781 Hilden / DE | 03 /
ZHAO, Ligang Urdenbacher Dorf Str. 49d 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | 04 /
FERENCZ, Andreas Kopernikusstr. 42 40223 Düsseldorf / DE | 05 /
SCHIEL, Manuel Wilhelm-Tell-Straße 27 40219 Düsseldorf / DE | 06 /
WELTERS, Tim Rüsternweg 4 40723 Hilden / DE | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 19174163.6 | 13.05.2019 | [2020/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3738771 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3738771 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B33Y70/00, B29C64/118, C08J3/24, C08L63/00 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
B29C64/118 (EP);
B29C64/106 (US);
B29C64/124 (EP);
B29C64/194 (EP);
B29C64/264 (EP,US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP);
B33Y70/00 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L33/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] |
Former [2020/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZWEIFACH HÄRTENDE EPOXIDFORMULIERUNGEN FÜR ANWENDUNGEN ZUM 3D-DRUCKEN | [2020/47] | English: | DUAL CURE EPOXY FORMULATIONS FOR 3D PRINTING APPLICATIONS | [2020/47] | French: | FORMULATIONS ÉPOXY À DURCISSEMENT DOUBLE POUR DES APPLICATIONS D'IMPRESSION 3D | [2020/47] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 14.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2023 | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/22] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2010104603 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-14 * claims 1,19 * * page 43, lines 1-29 *; | [Y]WO2017044381 (CARBON3D INC [US]) [Y] 1-14 * claims 1,2,6,9,11,12,14,16 * * page 14, line 5 - page 16, line 14 *; | [Y]US2018016464 (LISITSIN NATALY [IL], et al) [Y] 1-14 * claims 1-5,11,27-29 ** paragraph [0078] * |