EP3623141 - PREFORM SHAPING METHOD AND COMPOSITE FORMING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Subaru Corporation 1-20-8, Ebisu Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8554 / JP | [2020/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEKINE, Naoyuki c/o Subaru Corporation 1-20-8, Ebisu, Shibuya-ku Tokyo, 150-8554 / JP | 02 /
INOUE, Yuta c/o Subaru Corporation 1-20-8, Ebisu, Shibuya-ku Tokyo, 150-8554 / JP | [2020/12] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/12] | Application number, filing date | 19176335.8 | 24.05.2019 | [2020/12] | Priority number, date | JP20180173065 | 14.09.2018 Original published format: JP 2018173065 | [2020/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3623141 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3623141 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/34, B29D99/00 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
B29C70/34 (EP,US);
B29B11/06 (CN,KR);
B29C70/48 (CN,KR,US);
B29B11/16 (CN,KR);
B29C53/04 (KR);
B29C70/54 (CN);
B29D99/0003 (EP,US);
B32B1/00 (KR);
B32B5/26 (KR);
B29K2101/12 (US);
B29K2105/0881 (US);
B32B2260/021 (KR);
B32B2260/046 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] |
Former [2020/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORFORMFORMVERFAHREN UND VERBUNDFORMVERFAHREN | [2020/12] | English: | PREFORM SHAPING METHOD AND COMPOSITE FORMING METHOD | [2020/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN FORME DE PRÉFORME ET PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN FORME DE COMPOSITE | [2020/12] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 07.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005042410 (SAKONJO HIDEKI [JP], et al); | [X]FR2928294 (DUQUEINE RHONE ALPES [FR]); | [X]EP2233625 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [XA]EP2639047 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS SAS [FR]) | by applicant | JP2004276393 | JP2006069166 | JP2010150685 |