EP3576165 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A GAN TYPE LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHARLES, Matthew c/o CEA Grenoble 17 rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE Cedex 09 / FR | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | Guérin, Jean-Philippe Innovation Competence Group 310 avenue Berthelot 69372 Lyon Cedex 08 / FR | [2019/49] | Application number, filing date | 19176768.0 | 27.05.2019 | [2019/49] | Priority number, date | FR20180054602 | 29.05.2018 Original published format: FR 1854602 | [2019/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3576165 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3576165 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/04, H01L33/00, // H01L33/02 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
H01L33/04 (EP,US);
H01L33/0075 (EP,KR,US);
C30B25/02 (US);
C30B29/406 (US);
H01L21/02458 (EP);
H01L21/02507 (EP,US);
H01L21/0251 (EP,US);
H01L21/0254 (EP,US);
H01L21/02579 (EP);
H01L21/0262 (EP,US);
H01L33/0008 (KR);
H01L33/0025 (US);
H01L33/007 (EP,US);
H01L33/0095 (KR);
H01L33/025 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINER ELEKTROLUMINESZENZDIODE VOM TYP GAN | [2019/49] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A GAN TYPE LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE | [2019/49] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE DIODE ELECTRO- LUMINESCENTE DE TYPE GAN | [2019/49] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 09.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2019 | AL | 16.12.2020 | AT | 16.12.2020 | CY | 16.12.2020 | CZ | 16.12.2020 | DK | 16.12.2020 | EE | 16.12.2020 | ES | 16.12.2020 | FI | 16.12.2020 | HR | 16.12.2020 | IT | 16.12.2020 | LT | 16.12.2020 | LV | 16.12.2020 | MC | 16.12.2020 | MK | 16.12.2020 | NL | 16.12.2020 | PL | 16.12.2020 | RO | 16.12.2020 | RS | 16.12.2020 | SE | 16.12.2020 | SI | 16.12.2020 | SK | 16.12.2020 | SM | 16.12.2020 | TR | 16.12.2020 | BG | 16.03.2021 | NO | 16.03.2021 | GR | 17.03.2021 | IS | 16.04.2021 | PT | 16.04.2021 | IE | 27.05.2021 | LU | 27.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 27.05.2019 | |
AL | 16.12.2020 | ||
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
MK | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 27.05.2019 | |
AL | 16.12.2020 | ||
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
LU | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 16.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02093658 (EMCORE CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 8, lines 23-33 ** figure 2 *; | [A]US2012015502 (CUI JIE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0047] - [0049] * | by applicant | - "pLEDs with tunnel junction by MBE and MOCVD+MBE", Applied Physics Letters, (20150000), vol. 107, page 051107 |