EP3552804 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Concept Laser GmbH Rudolf-Diesel-Straße 14 96215 Lichtenfels / DE | [2023/14] |
Former [2019/42] | For all designated states CL Schutzrechtsverwaltungs GmbH An der Zeil 2 96215 Lichtenfels / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herzog, Frank Rennleinsweg 24 96215 Lichtenfels / DE | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | Hafner & Kohl PartmbB Schleiermacherstraße 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [2024/11] |
Former [2019/42] | Hafner & Kohl Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schleiermacherstraße 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 19177090.8 | 18.08.2015 | [2019/42] | Priority number, date | DE20141012425 | 22.08.2014 Original published format: DE102014012425 | [2019/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3552804 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3552804 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/153, B29C64/40, B22F3/24, B22F5/04, B22F10/28, B22F10/47, B22F10/64, // B33Y10/00, B33Y40/00 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
B22F3/24 (EP,US);
B33Y10/00 (CN,US);
B22F10/28 (EP,CN,US);
B22F10/47 (EP,CN,US);
B22F10/64 (EP,CN,US);
B22F5/04 (EP,US);
B29C64/153 (EP,US);
B29C64/40 (EP,US);
B22F2003/1042 (US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F10/28, B22F10/64, B22F2003/248 (CN,US,EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F10/28, B22F10/64, B22F2203/03 (US,EP,CN);
B22F2999/00, B22F10/28, B22F10/64, B22F3/24 (CN,US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/42] | B29C64/153, B29C64/40, B29C69/00, B22F3/105, B22F3/24, // B33Y10/00, B33Y40/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] |
Former [2019/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES DREIDIMENSIONALEN OBJEKTES | [2019/42] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT | [2019/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN OBJET TRIDIMENSIONNEL | [2019/42] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 16.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15753354.8 / EP3183083 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 13.03.2024 | ES | 13.03.2024 | FI | 13.03.2024 | HR | 13.03.2024 | LT | 13.03.2024 | LV | 13.03.2024 | NL | 13.03.2024 | SE | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.06.2024 | RS | 13.06.2024 | GR | 14.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
SE | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 13.03.2024 | |
NO | 13.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP1614526 (PORSCHE AG [DE]); | [XY]US2006236544 (HUSKAMP CHRISTOPHER S [US], et al); | [XY]US2012255176 (FLESCH THIERRY JEAN EMILE [FR], et al) | Examination | WO2013167903 |