EP3745442 - METHOD OF EXAMINING A SAMPLE USING A CHARGED PARTICLE MICROSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FEI Company 5350 NE Dawson Creek Drive Hillsboro, OR 97124-5793 / US | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klusácek, Jan FEI Company Patent Department P.O. Box 1745 5602 BS Eindhoven Noord-Brabant / NL | 02 /
Tuma, Tomás FEI Company Patent Department P.O. Box 1745 5602 BS Eindhoven Noord-Brabant / NL | 03 /
Petrek, Jirí FEI Company Patent Department P.O. Box 1745 5602 BS Eindhoven Noord-Brabant / NL | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | Janssen, Francis-Paul FEI Company Patent Department P.O.Box 1745 5602 BS Eindhoven / NL | [2020/49] | Application number, filing date | 19177314.2 | 29.05.2019 | [2020/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3745442 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/22, G01N23/2251, G01N23/2252, G06K9/66, G06T7/11, H01J37/28, H01J37/256 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
G01N23/2251 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/244 (CN,KR);
G01N23/04 (CN);
G01N23/046 (CN);
G01N23/20 (CN);
G01N23/203 (CN);
G01N23/22 (CN);
G01N23/2206 (US);
G01N23/2252 (EP,US);
G06F18/23213 (EP);
G06V10/763 (EP,US);
G06V20/69 (EP,US);
H01J37/20 (CN,KR);
H01J37/22 (KR);
H01J37/222 (EP);
H01J37/256 (EP);
H01J37/28 (EP,CN);
G01N2223/053 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] |
Former [2020/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSUCHUNG EINER PROBE MIT EINEM LADUNGSTRÄGERMIKROSKOP | [2020/49] | English: | METHOD OF EXAMINING A SAMPLE USING A CHARGED PARTICLE MICROSCOPE | [2020/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'EXAMEN D'UN ÉCHANTILLON À L'AIDE D'UN MICROSCOPE À PARTICULES CHARGÉES | [2020/49] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 31.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP2002323463 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [Y]US2011266440 (BOUGHORBEL FAYSAL [NL], et al); | [XYI]US2013015351 (KOOIJMAN CORNELIS SANDER [NL], et al); | [A]US2016307729 (LAZIC IVAN [NL], et al) |