EP3660713 - SECURING PRIVILEGED VIRTUALIZED EXECUTION INSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CyberArk Software Ltd. 9 Hapsagot Street Park Ofer 2 P.O. Box 3143 4951040 Petach-Tikva / IL | [2020/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOLER, Nimrod c/o CyberArk Software Ltd. 9 Hapsagot Street, Park Ofer 2, P.O. Box 3143 4951040 Petach-Tikva / IL | 02 /
LAZAROVITZ, Lavi c/o CyberArk Software Ltd. 9 Hapsagot Street, Park Ofer 2, P.O. Box 3143 4951040 Petach-Tikva / IL | [2020/23] | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [2020/23] | Application number, filing date | 19177788.7 | 31.05.2019 | [2020/23] | Priority number, date | US201916390542 | 22.04.2019 Original published format: US201916390542 | [2020/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3660713 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3660713 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/53, G06F21/55, G06F21/57 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
G06F21/53 (EP);
G06F21/577 (EP,US);
G06F21/554 (EP);
G06F21/556 (EP);
G06F9/45558 (US);
G06F2009/45587 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] |
Former [2020/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SICHERUNG VON PRIVILEGIERTEN VIRTUALISIERTEN AUSFÜHRUNGSINSTANZEN | [2020/23] | English: | SECURING PRIVILEGED VIRTUALIZED EXECUTION INSTANCES | [2020/23] | French: | SÉCURISATION D'INSTANCES D'EXÉCUTION VIRTUALISÉES PRIVILÉGIÉES | [2020/23] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 02.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.06.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 27.06.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.07.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 10.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 10.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.03.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 13.03.2024 | ES | 13.03.2024 | FI | 13.03.2024 | HR | 13.03.2024 | LT | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.06.2024 | RS | 13.06.2024 | GR | 14.06.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/34] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 13.03.2024 | |
NO | 13.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US8813233 (WILSON MATTHEW S [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7,10,14,15 * column 5 - column 7; figure 3 *; | [X]US2017116415 (STOPEL DIMA [IL], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0086]; figures 4, 6 *; | [A]US2018095739 (BASET SALMAN A [US], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract * |