EP3747904 - CD25-SPECIFIC CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTORS AND THEIR USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität Regensburg Universitätsstrasse 31 93053 Regensburg / DE | For all designated states Universität zu Köln Medizinische Fakultät Kerpener Straße 62 50937 Köln / DE | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABKEN, Hinrich Gotthard-Bauer-Straße 1 94333 Geiselhöring-Hainsbach / DE | 02 /
EHLING, Manuel Brink 3 48607 Ochtrup / DE | 03 /
HOMBACH, Andreas Parkstraße 10 50321 Brühl / DE | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/50] | Application number, filing date | 19177859.6 | 03.06.2019 | [2020/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3747904 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K35/17, C07K14/725, C07K14/705, C12N5/0783, A61P37/00 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
C07K16/2866 (EP,US);
A61K2239/28 (EP,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,US);
A61K39/4631 (EP,US);
A61K39/464429 (EP,US);
A61K39/464482 (EP,US);
A61P37/00 (EP,US);
C07K14/7051 (EP,US);
C07K14/70517 (EP);
C07K14/70521 (EP,US);
C07K14/7155 (EP,US);
C12N5/0636 (EP,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,US);
C07K2319/03 (EP,US);
C07K2319/33 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CD25-SPEZIFISCHE CHIMÄRE ANTIGENREZEPTOREN UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN | [2020/50] | English: | CD25-SPECIFIC CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTORS AND THEIR USES | [2020/50] | French: | RÉCEPTEURS D'ANTIGÈNE CHIMÉRIQUE SPÉCIFIQUE CD25 ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2020/50] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/46] | 30.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2015124715 (CELLECTIS [FR]); | [XI]WO2016008973 (UNIV KOELN [DE]); | [XI]WO2017222593 (ICELL GENE THERAPEUTICS LLC [US], et al); | [XI]WO2018191748 (MASSACHUSETTS GEN HOSPITAL [US]); |