EP3582229 - INTRAVENOUS DRIP MONITORING DEVICE, INTRAVENOUS DRIP MONITORING SYSTEM AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mikotek Information Inc. 3F., No.20, Aly. 18, Ln. 478, Ruiguang Rd. Neihu Dist. Taipei City 114 / TW | For all designated states Yang, Ching-Wen No. 23, Aly. 34, Ln. 185, Sec. 1, Xiuming Rd. Wenshan Dist. Taipei City 116 / TW | [2024/41] |
Former [2019/51] | For all designated states Mikotek Information Inc. 3F., No.20, Aly. 18, Ln. 478, Ruiguang Rd. Neihu Dist. Taipei City 114 / TW | ||
For all designated states Yang, Ching-Wen 3F., No.20, Aly. 18, Ln. 478, Ruiguang Rd. Neihu Dist. Taipei City 114 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Ching-Wen Wenshan Dist. Taipei City 116 / TW | [2024/38] |
Former [2019/51] | 01 /
YANG, Ching-Wen 3F., No.20, Aly. 18, Ln. 478, Ruiguang Rd., Neihu Dist. 114 Taipei City / TW | Representative(s) | Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte - Innsbruck Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Postfach 85 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/51] | Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Postfach 85 6010 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 19177880.2 | 03.06.2019 | [2019/51] | Priority number, date | TW20180119210 | 04.06.2018 Original published format: TW 107119210 | TW20180142537 | 28.11.2018 Original published format: TW 107142537 | [2019/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3582229 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G16H40/67, A61M5/168, A61M5/14, // G16H20/17 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
A61M5/1411 (EP);
A61M5/1684 (KR);
A61M5/16845 (EP);
A61M5/16895 (EP,KR);
G08B21/02 (KR);
G16H20/17 (EP,KR);
G16H40/67 (EP);
A61M2205/18 (KR);
A61M2205/3393 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2019/51] | G16H40/67, A61M5/168 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] |
Former [2019/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES INTRAVENÖSEN TROPFS, SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES INTRAVENÖSEN TROPFS UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2024/38] | English: | INTRAVENOUS DRIP MONITORING DEVICE, INTRAVENOUS DRIP MONITORING SYSTEM AND METHOD THEREOF | [2019/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE DE GOUTTE-À-GOUTTE INTRAVEINEUX, SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE DE GOUTTE-À-GOUTTE INTRAVEINEUX ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2019/51] |
Former [2019/51] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES INTRAVENÖSEN TROPFERS, SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES INTRAVENÖSEN TROPFERS UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | Examination procedure | 12.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 12.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2015346013 (FENG JUN [US], et al) [X] 7,10,12,15 * The whole document, in particular: Paragraphs [0004], [0017], [0019], [0021], [0024], [0026], [0043], [0047], [0048], [0051] - [0053]; Figures 2 - 5. * [A] 1-6[I] 8,9,11,13,14 |