EP3748342 - OPTICAL SENSOR FOR MEASURING A PROPERTY OF AN ELONGATE TEXTILE BODY IN A UNIFORM OPTICAL FIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebrüder Loepfe AG Kastellstrasse 10 8623 Wetzikon / CH | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlatter, Adrian Mühlackerstrasse 87 8046 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Griesshammer, Markus Landenbergstrasse 20 8037 Zürich / CH | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | E. Blum & Co. AG Franklinturm Hofwiesenstrasse 349 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2020/50] | Sutter, Kurt E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 19178679.7 | 06.06.2019 | [2020/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3748342 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3748342 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | D01H13/16, G01N21/89, G01N33/36 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
D01H13/165 (EP);
G01B11/08 (CN);
G01N21/8915 (EP);
G01N33/365 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/50] | G01N21/89, D01G31/00, D06H3/08, G01N33/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] |
Former [2020/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OPTISCHER SENSOR ZUR MESSUNG EINER EIGENSCHAFT EINES LÄNGLICHEN TEXTILKÖRPERS IN EINEM GLEICHMÄSSIGEN OPTISCHEN FELD | [2020/50] | English: | OPTICAL SENSOR FOR MEASURING A PROPERTY OF AN ELONGATE TEXTILE BODY IN A UNIFORM OPTICAL FIELD | [2020/50] | French: | CAPTEUR OPTIQUE POUR MESURER UNE PROPRIÉTÉ D'UN CORPS TEXTILE ALLONGÉ DANS UN CHAMP OPTIQUE UNIFORME | [2020/50] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 21.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.02.2024
07.02.2024
ADMISSIBLE Uster Technologies AG Sonnenbergstrasse 10 8610 Uster / CH Opponent's representative Pliska, Pavel Uster Technologies AG Sonnenbergstrasse 10 8610 Uster / CH | [2024/11] | 16.02.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.06.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2023 | CZ | 03.05.2023 | DK | 03.05.2023 | EE | 03.05.2023 | ES | 03.05.2023 | FI | 03.05.2023 | HR | 03.05.2023 | LT | 03.05.2023 | LV | 03.05.2023 | MC | 03.05.2023 | NL | 03.05.2023 | PL | 03.05.2023 | RO | 03.05.2023 | RS | 03.05.2023 | SE | 03.05.2023 | SI | 03.05.2023 | SK | 03.05.2023 | SM | 03.05.2023 | IE | 06.06.2023 | LU | 06.06.2023 | FR | 03.07.2023 | GB | 03.08.2023 | NO | 03.08.2023 | GR | 04.08.2023 | IS | 03.09.2023 | PT | 04.09.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
IE | 06.06.2023 | ||
LU | 06.06.2023 | ||
FR | 03.07.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
IE | 06.06.2023 | ||
LU | 06.06.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
LU | 06.06.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
PT | 04.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4716942 (JENSEN BORGE R [BE], et al); | [A]US4805671 (CASTELLINI CARLO [IT], et al); | [A]EP0572592 (LUWA AG ZELLWEGER [CH]); | [A]EP1643246 (BARCO NV [BE]); | [A]US2011303848 (JONES PHILIP COLEMAN [GB], et al) | by applicant | EP2827127 | Opposition | US4716942 | US4767172 | US2005174779 | EP1643246 | CN104278375 |