EP3579492 - PROTECTION OF AN ITERATIVE CALCULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics (Rousset) SAS ZI de Peynier Rousset Avenue Coq 13790 Rousset / FR | [2019/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIOP, Ibrahima 68 Rue Chalusset 13013 Marseille / FR | 02 /
LINGE, Yanis 8 Lotissement de la Bégude Allee des Cyprès 13710 Fuveau / FR | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beaumont 4, Place Robert Schuman B.P. 1529 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [2019/50] | Application number, filing date | 19178889.2 | 06.06.2019 | [2019/50] | Priority number, date | FR20180000584 | 08.06.2018 Original published format: FR 1800584 | [2019/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3579492 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00, G09C1/00 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
H04L9/003 (EP,US);
G06F21/72 (US);
G06F7/725 (US);
G09C1/00 (EP);
H04L9/004 (EP);
G06F2207/7219 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZ EINER ITERATIVEN BERECHNUNG | [2019/50] | English: | PROTECTION OF AN ITERATIVE CALCULATION | [2019/50] | French: | PROTECTION D'UN CALCUL ITÉRATIF | [2019/50] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 19.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/12] | 17.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1864211 (OBERTHUR CARD SYST SA [FR]) [I] 1-11 * figure 1 *; | [I]US2009097637 (BOSCHER ARNAUD [FR], et al) [I] 1-11 * figure 7 *; | [I]FR2979725 (OBERTHUR TECHNOLOGIES [FR]) [I] 1-11* page 15 *; | [I] - CHONG HEE KIM ET AL, Safe-Error Attack on SPA-FA Resistant Exponentiations Using a HW Modular Multiplier, INFORMATION SECURITY AND CRYPTOLOGY - ICISC 2007; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 273 - 281, (20071129), ISBN 978-3-540-76787-9, XP019083112 [I] 1-11 * page 276 * | by applicant | WO2006103341 | EP1864211 | US2009097637 | FR2979725 | - "Safe-Error Attack on SPA-FA Résistant Exponentiations Using a HW Modular Multiplier", CHONG HEE KIM et al., Information Security and Cryptology - ICISC 2007; [Lecture Notes in Computer Science, Springer Berlin Heidelberg, (20071129), pages 273 - 281 |