EP3578915 - H-PROFILE FOR BODY ARMOUR, IN PARTICULAR FOR CAMOUFLAGE AND BODY ARMOUR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Müller Patente und Schutzrechte GmbH & Co. KG Auf dem Schüffel 15 58513 Lüdenscheid / DE | [2021/30] |
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states MK Technology GmbH Auf dem Schüffel 15 58513 Lüdenscheid / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Tim Eggenpfad 5 58513 Lüdenscheid / DE | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schloss Schellenberg - Backhaus Renteilichtung 1 45134 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/50] | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 19179092.2 | 07.06.2019 | [2019/50] | Priority number, date | DE20182002721U | 08.06.2018 Original published format: DE 202018002721 U | [2019/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3578915 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3578915 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F41H5/013 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
F41H5/013 (EP);
F41H1/02 (EP);
F41H5/02 (EP);
F41H5/08 (EP);
A41D31/24 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/50] | F41H5/08, F41H1/02, F41H5/04, F41H5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] |
Former [2019/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | H-PROFIL FÜR EINE KÖRPERSCHUTZPANZERUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR DEN STICHSCHUTZ, SOWIE KÖRPERSCHUTZPANZERUNG | [2019/50] | English: | H-PROFILE FOR BODY ARMOUR, IN PARTICULAR FOR CAMOUFLAGE AND BODY ARMOUR | [2019/50] | French: | PROFILÉ H POUR UN BLINDAGE DE PROTECTION CORPORELLE, EN PARTICULIER POUR LA PROTECTION CONTRE LES PIQÛRES, AINSI QUE BLINDAGE DE PROTECTION CORPORELLE | [2019/50] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 12.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 07.04.2021 | CY | 07.04.2021 | DK | 07.04.2021 | EE | 07.04.2021 | FI | 07.04.2021 | LT | 07.04.2021 | LV | 07.04.2021 | MC | 07.04.2021 | MK | 07.04.2021 | MT | 07.04.2021 | PL | 07.04.2021 | RO | 07.04.2021 | RS | 07.04.2021 | SI | 07.04.2021 | SK | 07.04.2021 | SM | 07.04.2021 | IE | 07.06.2021 | LU | 07.06.2021 | GR | 08.07.2021 | IS | 07.08.2021 | PT | 09.08.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
MK | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | DK | 07.04.2021 | |
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | DK | 07.04.2021 | |
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 07.06.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IS | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | DK | 07.04.2021 | |
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
LU | 07.06.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IS | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | DK | 07.04.2021 | |
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IS | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | DK | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
LT | 07.04.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE29513029U (SITEK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 4 * * figure - *; | [A]GB2303534 (TBA INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * claim 1 ** figure - *; | [AD]DE10110851 (MUELLER LOTHAR [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0027] * * figure - *; | [A]WO2009023638 (GAGNE ROBERT R [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0049] * * figure - * | by applicant | DE10110851 |