EP3575833 - DISTANCE ASSESSMENT IN A GNSS SYSTEM USING PARTICLE FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Q-Free ASA P.O. Box 3974 Leangen 7443 Trondheim / NO | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lykkja, Ola Martin Q-FREE ASA Östaveien 29 1476 Rasta / NO | 02 /
Storvik, Geir Olve Q-FREE ASA Johs Faales vei 2 1363 Hövik / NO | 03 /
Gjevestad, Jon Glenn Q-FREE ASA Skogfaret 17 1430 Aas / NO | 04 /
Löland, Anders Selvbyggerveien 36 0591 Oslo / NO | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | Curo AS Vestre Rosten 81 7075 Tiller / NO | [2019/49] | Application number, filing date | 19179568.1 | 21.05.2015 | [2019/49] | Priority number, date | NO20140000686 | 03.06.2014 Original published format: NO 20140686 | [2019/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3575833 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/14, G01S19/42, G01S19/39, // G07B15/06 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
G01S19/42 (EP,US);
G08G1/0112 (US);
G01S19/14 (US);
G01S19/393 (EP);
G07B15/063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] |
Former [2019/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ENTFERNUNGSMESSUNG IN EINEM GNSS-SYSTEM MITHILFE EINES PARTIKELFILTERS | [2019/49] | English: | DISTANCE ASSESSMENT IN A GNSS SYSTEM USING PARTICLE FILTER | [2019/49] | French: | ÉVALUATION DE LA DISTANCE DANS UN SYSTÈME GNSS AU MOYEN D'UN FILTRE À PARTICULES | [2019/49] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15168779.5 / EP2955546 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 28.08.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 28.08.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.09.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.08.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 28.08.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.09.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 28.08.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 28.08.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.09.2020 | Decision despatched | 28.08.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 28.08.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.09.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP1332336 (NIRA DYNAMICS AB [SE]) [AD] 3* paragraph [0047] *; | [Y] - TOLEDO-MOREO R ET AL, "Performance Aspects of Navigation Systems for GNSS-Based Road User Charging", GNSS 2010 - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 23RD INTERNATIONAL TECHNICAL MEETING OF THE SATELLITE DIVISION OF THE INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION (ION GNSS 2010), THE INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION, 8551 RIXLEW LANE SUITE 360 MANASSAS, VA 20109, USA, (20100924), pages 1157 - 1165, XP056000228 [Y] 1-4 * page 1158, right-hand column, third paragraph * * page 1159, left-hand column, section "GNSS for Road User Charging" * * page 1159, right-hand column, last paragraph * * page 1162, right-hand column - page 1164, left-hand column, section "Integrity Provision" * | [Y] - JACQUES GEORGY ET AL, "Nonlinear filtering for tightly coupled RISS/GPS integration", POSITION LOCATION AND NAVIGATION SYMPOSIUM (PLANS), 2010 IEEE/ION, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100504), doi:10.1109/PLANS.2010.5507327, ISBN 978-1-4244-5036-7, pages 1014 - 1021, XP031935920 [Y] 1-4 * Equations (12), (14), (19), (20) * * Sections I, IV.A, IV.B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PLANS.2010.5507327 | by applicant | WO0239063 | EP1332336 | EP1811480 | US7324017 | US2009132164 | EP2230644 | WO2012130889 | US2013265191 | - OLIVIER CAPPESIMON J. GODSILLERIC MOULINES, "An Overview of Existing Methods and Recent Advances in Sequential Monte Carlo", Proceedings of the IEEE, (20070000), vol. 95, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1109/JPROC.2007.893250, XP011186717 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPROC.2007.893250 | - FREDRIK GUSTAFSSONFREDRIK GUNNARSSONNICLAS BERGMANURBAN FORSSELLJONAS JANSSONRICKARD KARLSSONPER-JOHAN NORDLUND, "IEEE Transactions on Signal Processing, Special issue on Monte Carlo methods for statistical signal processing", Particle Filters for Positioning, Navigation and Tracking, (20020200), no. 2 |