EP3564803 - PORTABLE MULTIFUNCTION DEVICE, METHOD, AND GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACE FOR ADJUSTING AN INSERTION POINT MARKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOCIENDA, Kenneth 1297 Cherry Avenue San Jose, CA 95125 / US | 02 /
LEMAY, Stephen, Olivier 735 Kirkham Street San Francisco, CA 94122 / US | 03 /
CHAUDHRI, Imran 57 Beaumont San Francisco, CA 94118 / US | 04 /
ORDING, Bas 44 Newburg Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | Barton, Russell Glen Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/45] | Barnfather, Karl Jon Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2019/45] | Barnfather, Karl Jon Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19180671.0 | 25.10.2007 | [2019/45] | Priority number, date | US20060553436 | 26.10.2006 Original published format: US 553436 | US20070879253P | 07.01.2007 Original published format: US 879253 P | US20070879469P | 08.01.2007 Original published format: US 879469 P | US20070947382P | 29.06.2007 Original published format: US 947382 P | US20070923453 | 24.10.2007 Original published format: US 923453 | [2019/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3564803 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3564803 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048, G06F3/0488 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
G06F3/0488 (EP);
G06F3/0486 (EP);
H04M1/72403 (EP);
H04M1/72436 (EP);
G06F2203/04805 (EP);
G06F2203/04806 (EP);
H04M1/2747 (EP);
H04M1/67 (EP);
H04M2250/12 (EP);
H04M2250/22 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/45] | Title | German: | TRAGBARE MULTIFUNKTIONSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND GRAFISCHE BENUTZEROBERFLÄCHE ZUR ANPASSUNG EINES EINFÜHRUNGSPUNKTMARKERS | [2019/45] | English: | PORTABLE MULTIFUNCTION DEVICE, METHOD, AND GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACE FOR ADJUSTING AN INSERTION POINT MARKER | [2019/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF MULTIFONCTION PORTABLE, PROCÉDÉ ET INTERFACE D'UTILISATEUR GRAPHIQUE POUR RÉGLER UN MARQUEUR DE POINT D'INSERTION | [2019/45] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 21.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07854411.1 / EP2095214 | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2023 | CZ | 08.11.2023 | DK | 08.11.2023 | EE | 08.11.2023 | ES | 08.11.2023 | IT | 08.11.2023 | LT | 08.11.2023 | LV | 08.11.2023 | NL | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | RO | 08.11.2023 | SE | 08.11.2023 | SK | 08.11.2023 | BG | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | PT | 08.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
CZ | 08.11.2023 | ||
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004196267 (KAWAI JUN [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0064] ** figures 3a-10 *; | [XI]US2006022955 (KENNEDY PETER [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6-9 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0078] * * figures 1-12n * [I] 3,5 | by applicant | US6323846 | US2002015024 | US6570557 | US6677932 | US2005190059 | US2006017692 | US20040840862 | US20040903964 | US20050038590 | US20050048264 | US20050228758 | US20050228700 | US20050228737 | US20050241839 | US20050240788 | US20050322549 | US20050322550 | US20050322552 | US20060367749 | US20060381313 | US20060459606 | US20060459615 | US20060459602 | US20060553436 | US20070620641 | US20070620642 | US20070883819 |