EP3564031 - A PANEL COMPRISING A POLYMERIC COMPOSITE LAYER AND A REINFORCEMENT LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flooring Industries Limited, SARL 10b, rue des Mérovingiens (Z.I. Bourmicht) 8070 Bertrange / LU | [2021/27] |
Former [2020/43] | For all designated states Unilin, BV Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE | ||
Former [2019/45] | For all designated states Unilin, BVBA Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERMEULEN, Bruno Paul Louis Grinaraweg 14 3680 Aldeneik-Maaseik / BE | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/45] | De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 19180845.0 | 30.06.2011 | [2019/45] | Priority number, date | EP20100167985 | 30.06.2010 Original published format: EP 10167985 | [2019/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3564031 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B32B21/10, E04C2/18, E04C2/22, E04F13/16, E04F15/02, E04F15/10 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
E04C2/22 (EP,RU,US);
B32B21/02 (EP,US);
B32B21/08 (EP,US);
B32B21/10 (EP,US);
B32B5/028 (EP,US);
B32B5/12 (EP,US);
B32B5/30 (EP,US);
E04C2/246 (EP,US);
E04F13/0878 (EP,US);
E04F13/16 (RU);
E04F15/10 (RU);
E04F15/102 (EP);
E04F15/107 (EP);
E04F15/181 (EP,US);
B32B2260/023 (EP,US);
B32B2260/028 (EP,US);
B32B2307/734 (EP,US);
B32B2471/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] |
Former [2019/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PANEEL MIT EINER POLYMERVERBUNDSTOFFSCHICHT UND EINER VERSTÄRKUNGSSCHICHT | [2019/45] | English: | A PANEL COMPRISING A POLYMERIC COMPOSITE LAYER AND A REINFORCEMENT LAYER | [2019/45] | French: | PANNEAU COMPRENANT UNE COUCHE COMPOSITE POLYMÈRE ET UNE COUCHE DE RENFORT | [2019/45] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 06.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/13] | 28.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11728282.2 / EP2588311 | EP17168881.5 / EP3243653 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004242095 (PRAKASH AMIT [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [00 8] , [0 11] - [0013]; claims 1-14 *; | [A]DE102004035011 (KRUEGER HEINRICH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0014] , [0019] , [0036]; figures 1-4; claims 1,6,7,10,11 *; | [A]EP1847385 (KRONOTEC AG [CH]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0007] - [0014] - [0017] , [0019] - [0023] *; | [AD]WO2008122668 (SPANOLUX N V DIV BALTERIO [BE], et al) [AD] 1-10 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 19; figures 1,2; claims 14-20 * * page 9, line 18 - line 28 *; | [A] - TEISCHINGER, ALFRED, "Holz-Kunststoff-Verbundwerkstoffe (WPC) - Möglichkeiten und Grenzen einer neuen Werkstoffgeneration", SCHWEIZ. Z. FORSTWES., (2005), vol. 156, no. 11, pages 416 - 419, XP002606106 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - Klysov, A.A., Wood-Plastic composites, New York (US), Wiley-Interscience, (2007), pages 26 - 28, ISBN 978-0-470-14891-4, XP002606107 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9926773 | WO2008122668 |