EP3584153 - VARIABLE CAMBER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bombardier Inc. 400 Côte Vertu Road West Dorval, Québec H4S 1Y9 / CA | [2019/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOKHTARIAN, Farzad 20610 Lakeshore Road Baie d'Urfe, Québec H9X 1R4 / CA | [2019/52] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Matthew William Cawston Field IP Ltd. Hillside Main Street Frankton, Warwickshire CV23 9PB / GB | [2019/52] | Application number, filing date | 19181074.6 | 18.06.2019 | [2019/52] | Priority number, date | US201862687565P | 20.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862687565 P | [2019/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3584153 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B64C3/50, B64C9/18, B64C9/08, B64C9/02, B64C9/06 | [2019/52] | CPC: |
B64C3/50 (EP,US);
B64C9/02 (EP,CN,US);
B64C1/26 (CN);
B64C21/02 (US);
B64C9/06 (EP);
B64C9/08 (EP);
B64C9/18 (EP);
B64C9/20 (CN);
B64C9/34 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] |
Former [2019/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM MIT VARIABLER WÖLBUNG | [2019/52] | English: | VARIABLE CAMBER SYSTEM | [2019/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CAMBRAGE VARIABLE | [2019/52] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 25.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.05.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 25.05.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.06.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.10.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 08.10.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.10.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2772058 (GRANT CHARLES H); | [X]US3092354 (ALBERTO ALVAREZ-CALDERON); | [XA]US4015787 (MAIELI JOSEPH R, et al); | [A]US4784355 (BRINE GERALD T [US]); | [X]US6328265 (DIZDAREVIC FARUK [US]); |