EP3754074 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR HANDLING WEAVING ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Groz-Beckert KG Parkweg 2 72458 Albstadt / DE | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GESING, Karl-Heinz Ritterstrasse 25 46348 Raesfeld / DE | 02 /
KAILER, Stefan Mehlbeerweg 10 72469 Messstetten / DE | 03 /
PFEFFER, Bernd Mörikestrasse7 72401 Haigerloch / DE | 04 /
ACKER, Michael Amalienstrasse 24 72458 Albstadt / DE | 05 /
GERTH, Christian Dornerweg 2 88709 Meersburg / DE | [2020/52] | Application number, filing date | 19181184.3 | 19.06.2019 | [2020/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3754074 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3754074 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | D03J1/14 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
D03J1/14 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] |
Former [2020/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HANDHABUNG VON WEBGESCHIRRELEMENTEN | [2020/52] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR HANDLING WEAVING ELEMENTS | [2020/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE MANIPULATION DES ÉLÉMENTS DE HARNAIS | [2020/52] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 23.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 03.01.2024 | HR | 03.01.2024 | PL | 03.01.2024 | NO | 03.04.2024 | RS | 03.04.2024 | GR | 04.04.2024 | IS | 03.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 03.01.2024 | |
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | HR | 03.01.2024 | |
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 03.04.2024 | |
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 03.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO9205303 (ZELLWEGER USTER AG [CH]); | [A]CH685203 (GIFU PREFECTURE [JP]); | [A]WO0011252 (STAEUBLI AG PFAEFFIKON [CH], et al) | Examination | EP3754070 | by applicant | WO9205303 | DE69008100T |