EP3586582 - PLANTING UNIT WITH A SUPPORTING ELEMENT AND SOWING MACHINE COMPRISING SUCH UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuhn SAS 4 impasse des Fabriques 67700 Saverne / FR | [2020/29] |
Former [2020/01] | For all designated states Kuhn SA (Societe Anonyme) 4 impasse des Fabriques 67700 Saverne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIRIAT, Laurent 4 rue des Acacias 67440 Westhouse-Marmoutier / FR | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nuss 10, rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | [2020/01] | Application number, filing date | 19181520.8 | 20.06.2019 | [2020/01] | Priority number, date | FR20180055556 | 22.06.2018 Original published format: FR 1855556 | [2020/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3586582 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3586582 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A01C5/06 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
A01C5/068 (EP,US);
A01C7/08 (BR);
A01C5/064 (EP,US);
A01C15/00 (US);
A01C7/06 (US);
A01C7/082 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] |
Former [2020/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PFLANZEINHEIT MIT EINEM STÜTZORGAN UND SÄMASCHINE, DIE SOLCHE EINHEITEN UMFASST | [2020/01] | English: | PLANTING UNIT WITH A SUPPORTING ELEMENT AND SOWING MACHINE COMPRISING SUCH UNITS | [2020/01] | French: | UNITÉ D'IMPLANTATION AVEC UN ORGANE D'APPUI ET SEMOIR COMPRENANT DE TELLES UNITÉS | [2020/01] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 24.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.06.2019 | AL | 12.05.2021 | CY | 12.05.2021 | DK | 12.05.2021 | EE | 12.05.2021 | FI | 12.05.2021 | HR | 12.05.2021 | LT | 12.05.2021 | LV | 12.05.2021 | MC | 12.05.2021 | MK | 12.05.2021 | NL | 12.05.2021 | PL | 12.05.2021 | RO | 12.05.2021 | RS | 12.05.2021 | SI | 12.05.2021 | SK | 12.05.2021 | SM | 12.05.2021 | IE | 20.06.2021 | LU | 20.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | BG | 12.08.2021 | NO | 12.08.2021 | GR | 13.08.2021 | IS | 12.09.2021 | PT | 13.09.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 20.06.2019 | |
AL | 12.05.2021 | ||
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
IE | 20.06.2021 | ||
LU | 20.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
IE | 20.06.2021 | ||
LU | 20.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
IE | 20.06.2021 | ||
LU | 20.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
IE | 20.06.2021 | ||
LU | 20.06.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
IE | 20.06.2021 | ||
LU | 20.06.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | DK | 12.05.2021 | |
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
IE | 20.06.2021 | ||
LU | 20.06.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | DK | 12.05.2021 | |
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
IE | 20.06.2021 | ||
LU | 20.06.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | DK | 12.05.2021 | |
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
LU | 20.06.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | DK | 12.05.2021 | |
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | DK | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 12.05.2021 | |
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | FI | 12.05.2021 | |
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | FI | 12.05.2021 | |
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 12.05.2021 | |
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | FI | 12.05.2021 | |
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 12.05.2021 | |
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 12.05.2021 | |
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005061219 (SAUDER GREGG A [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 34 * * page 4, paragraphs 37,39 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2012266794 (SCHAFFERT PAUL E [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 27 * * page 3, paragraphs 27,28,29,36,37 * * page 4, paragraph 37 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2014209001 (SCHAFFERT PAUL E [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 3, paragraphs 62,67,68 * * page 4, paragraphs 68,69 * * page 7, paragraph 91 ** figure -; claim - *; | [AD]US2016262304 (HAGNY MATTHEW P [US], et al) [AD] 1-12 * abstract * * page 2, paragraphs 24,26 * * page 3, paragraphs 27, 31,33 * * figure -; claim - * |