EP3588430 - IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ENHANCING A PHASE DISTRIBUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Microsystems CMS GmbH Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALTER, Kai Schelmengrubweg 33 69198 Schriesheim / DE | 02 /
DEISSLER, Benjamin John-F. -Kennedy-Str. 26a 35510 Butzbach / DE | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/01] | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19181836.8 | 21.06.2019 | [2020/01] | Priority number, date | WO2018EP67244 | 27.06.2018 Original published format: PCT/EP2018/067244 | WO2019EP58089 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: PCT/EP2019/058089 | WO2019EP58084 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: PCT/EP2019/058084 | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3588430 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
G06T5/70 (EP);
G06T5/20 (EP);
G06T5/60 (EP);
G06T5/73 (EP);
G02B21/086 (EP);
G02B21/241 (EP);
G02B21/365 (EP);
G02B3/14 (EP);
G06T2207/10056 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] |
Former [2020/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG EINER PHASENVERTEILUNG | [2020/01] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ENHANCING A PHASE DISTRIBUTION | [2020/01] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES ET PROCÉDÉ POUR AMÉLIORER UNE DISTRIBUTION DE PHASE | [2020/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 01.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013321908 (BABACAN S DERIN [US], et al); | [XAYI]EP3156937 (UNIVERSITÉ PARIS EST CRÉTEIL [FR]); |