EP3719430 - CONTINUOUS FLOW DRYING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DRYING WORKPIECES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.01.2021 [2021/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisenmann SE Tübinger Strasse 81 71032 Böblingen / DE | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von Bargen, Jonas Goldregenweg 13 70565 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/42] |
Former [2020/41] | 01 /
Burkart, Jonas Goldregenweg 13 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Representative(s) | Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Azenbergstraße 35 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/41] | Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Epplestraße 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 19181902.8 | 24.06.2019 | [2020/41] | Priority number, date | DE201810115235 | 25.06.2018 Original published format: DE102018115235 | [2020/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3719430 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F26B25/00 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
F26B25/06 (EP,US);
F26B7/00 (US);
B05D3/0413 (CN);
B05D3/0426 (CN);
F26B15/10 (EP,US);
F26B25/003 (EP);
F26B2210/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCHLAUFTROCKENANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUM TROCKNEN VON WERKSTÜCKEN | [2020/41] | English: | CONTINUOUS FLOW DRYING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DRYING WORKPIECES | [2020/41] | French: | INSTALLATION DE SÉCHAGE CONTINU ET PROCÉDÉ DE SÉCHAGE DE PIÈCES | [2020/41] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 31.07.2019 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2020/41] | 03.08.2020 | Resumption of proceedings | [2020/41] | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008115384 (KRIZEK JOSEF [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 4-5 * * paragraphs [0051] - [0062] *; | [I]US2008229608 (KRIZEK JOSEF [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0067] - [0090]; figures 4-7 *; | [A]DE102006057158 (EISENMANN ANLAGENBAU GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0025] - [0042]; figures 1-2 *; | [A]DE10354165 (EISENMANN KG MASCHBAU [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2006055091 (DOLL MARTIN [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figure 4 *; | [A]US2011162576 (SCHAEFER WOLF-HASSO [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,4,6,7 * |