EP3591258 - CONVEYOR BELT, USE OF SAME, METHOD FOR ITS PREPARATION AND CONVEYING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heimbach GmbH An Gut Nazareth 73 52353 Düren / DE | [2020/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRASCHAK, Dirk Flämische Alle 19 41748 Viersen / DE | 02 /
DEHEZ, Frederik Klosterstr. 25 4770 Montenau Amel / DE | [2020/02] | Representative(s) | Paul & Albrecht Patentanwälte PartG mbB Stresemannallee 4b 41460 Neuss / DE | [2020/02] | Application number, filing date | 19182095.0 | 24.06.2019 | [2020/02] | Priority number, date | DE201820103781U | 02.07.2018 Original published format: DE 202018103781 U | [2020/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3591258 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3591258 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16G3/04, B65G15/30, B64F1/36, B65G15/34, B65G15/54 | [2020/02] | CPC: |
B65G15/34 (EP);
B64F1/368 (EP);
B65G15/30 (EP);
B65G15/54 (EP);
F16G3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] |
Former [2020/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TRANSPORTBAND, VERWENDUNG EINES SOLCHEN, VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG SOWIE FÖRDEREINRICHTUNG | [2020/02] | English: | CONVEYOR BELT, USE OF SAME, METHOD FOR ITS PREPARATION AND CONVEYING DEVICE | [2020/02] | French: | BANDE DE TRANSPORT, UTILISATION D'UNE TELLE BANDE DE TRANSPORT, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION AINSI QUE DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT | [2020/02] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 09.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 11.10.2023 | DK | 11.10.2023 | EE | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | IT | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | NL | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 11.10.2023 | |
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 11.10.2023 | |
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 11.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB846411 (BRITISH WEDGE WIRE COMPANY LTD) [AD] 1,8,9,14-17* figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0098502 (HEIMBACH GMBH THOMAS JOSEF [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,8,10,15-17 * page 8, line 17 - page 10, line 1 * * page 12, line 19 - line 27 * * figures 3-5 *; | [XI]EP0396035 (HEIMBACH GMBH THOMAS JOSEF [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6,8-11,13,14,16,17 * figure 5 * * column 11, line 5 - line 51 * * column 13, line 1 - line 17 * [I] 2,7,12,15 | by applicant | GB846411 | EP2266827 |