EP3757691 - AUTOMATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steindl, Günter Katharinenstr. 22 92284 Poppenricht / DE | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 19182567.8 | 26.06.2019 | [2021/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3757691 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042, G06F1/16, G06F9/455, G06F9/50 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
G05B19/0421 (EP);
G06F15/167 (EP);
G06F9/5077 (EP);
Y02D10/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERUNGSGERÄT | [2021/01] | English: | AUTOMATION APPARATUS | [2021/01] | French: | APPAREIL D'AUTOMATISATION | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/49] | 21.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP2897007 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0026]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0039]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0045]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0059]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0019]; figure 1 * [Y] 3-5 [I] 6,7; | [A]DE102015101370 (FISHER ROSEMOUNT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0030]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0037]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041]; figure 1 * | [Y] - Belkin, "Bluetooth USB Adapter", (20030721), URL: https://fccid.io/K7SF8T003V2/User-Manual/manual-341581.pdf, (20191118), XP055643338 [Y] 3-5,7 * Folie 3; page 4 * * Folien 28-30; page 29 - page 31 * | [Y] - Belkin, "Blutetooth USB Adapter - User Manual", (20030707), URL: https://fccid.io/K7SF8T003V2/User-Manual/manual-341581, (20191118), XP055643303 [Y] 3-5,7 * page 36 * | [Y] - Intel, "EMI Design Guidelines for USB Components", (20170814), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20170814214457if_/http://www.ti.com/sc/docs/apps/msp/intrface/usb/emitest.pdf, (20191118), XP055643260 [Y] 3-5 * Kapitel 5.1; page 5 - page 6q; figure 6 * | [Y] - Intel, "EMI Design Guidelines for USB Components (Date)", (20170814), URL: web.archive.org/web/20170314214457/https://www.ti.com/sc/docs/apps/msp/intrface/usb/emitest.pdf, (20191118), XP055643266 [Y] 3-5 * WaybackMachine Kopfzeile * |