EP3757217 - METHODS FOR PROTEIN PURIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A. Rue de l'Institut, 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Klaczynska, Sarah Elizabeth GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents, CN925.1 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | Sanderson, Andrew John GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents, CN9.25.1 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 19183033.0 | 27.06.2019 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3757217 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/62, C07K1/18 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
C12P19/04 (EP,US);
C07K1/18 (EP,US);
A61K38/04 (US);
C07K14/21 (EP,US);
C07K14/31 (EP,US);
C12N15/00 (US);
C07K2319/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PROTEINAUFREINIGUNG | [2021/01] | English: | METHODS FOR PROTEIN PURIFICATION | [2021/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PURIFICATION DE PROTÉINES | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2021/21] | 06.02.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US4365170 | EP0161188 | EP0208375 | US4673574 | EP0477508 | WO9315760 | WO9508348 | WO9629094 | WO03074687 | WO2006119987 | US2007184072 | WO2009104074 | WO2011006261 | WO2011138361 | WO2014037585 | WO2013EP68737 | WO2018EP85854 |