EP3760903 - MULTILAYERED TUBE AND METHODS OF USE AND MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/01] | MULTILAYERED TUBE | ||
[2021/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HakaGerodur AG Mooswiesstrasse 67 9200 Gossau / CH | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOLLENWEIDER, Bruno Kistlerstrasse 13a 8864 Reichenburg / CH | 02 /
ALAIMO, Hugo Leumenweg 14 8864 Reichenburg / CH | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [2022/15] |
Former [2021/01] | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 19184335.8 | 04.07.2019 | [2021/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3760903 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3760903 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16L9/12, F16L13/02, F16L47/02, F16L57/00 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
F16L9/121 (EP);
F16L13/0272 (EP);
F16L47/02 (EP);
F16L57/005 (EP);
F16L2011/047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] |
Former [2021/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGES ROHR SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG UND HERSTELLUNG | [2021/49] | English: | MULTILAYERED TUBE AND METHODS OF USE AND MANUFACTURE | [2021/49] | French: | TUYAU MULTICOUCHE ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION ET DE FABRICATION | [2021/49] |
Former [2021/01] | MEHRSCHICHTIGES ROHR | ||
Former [2021/01] | MULTILAYERED TUBE | ||
Former [2021/01] | TUYAU MULTICOUCHE | Examination procedure | 14.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 14.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.07.2019 | AL | 13.04.2022 | CY | 13.04.2022 | EE | 13.04.2022 | ES | 13.04.2022 | HR | 13.04.2022 | LT | 13.04.2022 | LV | 13.04.2022 | MC | 13.04.2022 | MK | 13.04.2022 | RO | 13.04.2022 | RS | 13.04.2022 | SI | 13.04.2022 | SK | 13.04.2022 | SM | 13.04.2022 | TR | 13.04.2022 | IE | 04.07.2022 | LU | 04.07.2022 | BG | 13.07.2022 | GR | 14.07.2022 | BE | 31.07.2022 | IS | 13.08.2022 | PT | 16.08.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/25] | HU | 04.07.2019 | |
AL | 13.04.2022 | ||
CY | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
MK | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
IE | 04.07.2022 | ||
LU | 04.07.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
CY | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
MK | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
IE | 04.07.2022 | ||
LU | 04.07.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
CY | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
IE | 04.07.2022 | ||
LU | 04.07.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
IE | 04.07.2022 | ||
LU | 04.07.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
LU | 04.07.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
LU | 04.07.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | EE | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | EE | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | ES | 13.04.2022 | |
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | ES | 13.04.2022 | |
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | ES | 13.04.2022 | |
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 13.04.2022 | |
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE20303602U (HAKA GERODUR AG BENKEN [CH]) [A] 1-15 * page 5, line 28 - page 7, line 31; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE4291982 (UPONOR INNOVATION AB [SE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1-4 *; | [AD]DE102006049338 (STRUMANN WERNER EGEPLAST [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP2716439 (EGEPLAST INTERNAT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0040]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP2998635 (HAKAGERODUR AG [CH]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1-2 * | by applicant | DD279052 | DE19741035 | DE102006049338 |