EP3581245 - ANTIBODIES TO TAU AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [2022/04] |
Former [2019/51] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND CO. Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alvarado, Alberto c/o Eli Lilly and Company P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | 02 /
Driver, David c/o Eli Lilly and Company P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolise, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | 03 /
Hayashi, Mansuo Lu c/o Eli Lilly and Company P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | 04 /
Lu, Jirong c/o Eli Lilly and Company P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | Boanas-Evans, Duncan Richard Eli Lilly and Company Limited 8 Arlington Square West Downshire Way Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 1PU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/52] | Kent, Lindsey Ruth Eli Lilly and Company Limited 8 Arlington Square West Downshire Way Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 1PU / GB | ||
Former [2019/51] | Kent, Lindsey Ruth Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Center Erl Wood Manor Sunninghill Road, Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 19184449.7 | 18.02.2016 | [2019/51] | Priority number, date | US201562121116P | 26.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562121116 P | [2019/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3581245 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3581245 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61P25/28, A61K39/00, C07K16/18 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
C07K16/18 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K49/16 (US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07K16/00 (US);
C12N15/00 (US);
C12N15/09 (US);
C12N15/10 (US);
A01K2267/0318 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/0005 (US);
A61K39/0007 (US);
A61K39/395 (US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K49/0058 (US);
A61K51/1018 (US);
C07H21/00 (US);
C07H21/04 (US);
C07K14/435 (US);
C07K14/47 (US);
C07K14/4711 (US);
C07K2317/21 (US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/34 (IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/51 (IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/515 (IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/52 (KR,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/567 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/622 (US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/90 (KR);
C07K2317/92 (EP,CN,IL,US);
C07K2317/94 (EP,CN,IL,US);
C12N5/06 (US);
C12N5/0602 (US);
C12P21/00 (US);
C12P21/02 (US);
G01N2800/28 (US);
G01N2800/2814 (US);
G01N2800/2821 (US);
G01N2800/52 (US);
G01N2800/56 (US);
G01N33/573 (US);
G01N33/577 (US);
G01N33/6854 (US);
G01N33/6896 (US);
Y10S424/80 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] |
Former [2019/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN TAU UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2019/51] | English: | ANTIBODIES TO TAU AND USES THEREOF | [2019/51] | French: | ANTICORPS POUR TAU ET UTILISATIONS ASSOCIÉES | [2019/51] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 18.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16706741.2 / EP3261720 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.2023 | CZ | 27.12.2023 | EE | 27.12.2023 | FI | 27.12.2023 | HR | 27.12.2023 | LT | 27.12.2023 | LV | 27.12.2023 | MC | 27.12.2023 | NL | 27.12.2023 | PL | 27.12.2023 | RO | 27.12.2023 | RS | 27.12.2023 | SE | 27.12.2023 | SK | 27.12.2023 | SM | 27.12.2023 | BG | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.03.2024 | GR | 28.03.2024 | IS | 27.04.2024 | PT | 29.04.2024 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 27.12.2023 | |
CZ | 27.12.2023 | ||
EE | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
PL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RO | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SK | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
PT | 29.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 27.12.2023 | |
CZ | 27.12.2023 | ||
EE | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RO | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 28.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO2012149365 (UNIV NORTHWESTERN [US], et al); | [IA]WO2014059442 (ARIZONA BOARD AGENTS A BODY CORPORATE OF THE STATE OF ARIZONA ACTING FOR AND ON BEHALF OF ARIZONA ST [US], et al); | [IA]WO2014100600 (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US], et al); | by applicant | WO2011026031 | WO2012049570 | WO2013050567 | US8926974 |