EP3591131 - CEILING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hunter Douglas Industries B.V. Blaak 555 3011 GB Rotterdam / NL | [2024/04] |
Former [2020/02] | For all designated states Hunter Douglas Industries B.V. Piekstraat 2 3071 EL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANGEVELD, Michiel c/o HUNTER DOUGLAS INDUSTRIES B.V. Piekstraat 2 3071 EL Rotterdam / NL | 02 /
FICK, John c/o HUNTER DOUGLAS INDUSTRIES B.V. Piekstraat 2 3071 EL Rotterdam / NL | [2020/02] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2024/15] |
Former [2020/02] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19184484.4 | 04.07.2019 | [2020/02] | Priority number, date | EP20180181740 | 04.07.2018 Original published format: EP 18181740 | [2020/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3591131 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3591131 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E04B9/36, // E04B9/16, E04B9/26 | [2020/02] | CPC: |
E04B9/36 (EP);
E04B9/065 (US);
E04B9/16 (EP,US);
E04B9/28 (US);
E04B9/363 (US);
E04B9/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] |
Former [2020/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DECKENSYSTEM | [2020/02] | English: | CEILING SYSTEM | [2020/02] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PLAFOND | [2020/02] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 02.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE1459927 (DALBY ERIC); | [XAI]US4328653 (ANDERLE JOSEPH A); | [A]US6336302 (BRUGMAN JOHANNES ANTONIUS HEND [NL], et al) | Examination | KR20170015586 | US2017044767 |