EP3760132 - DEVICE FOR SUPPORTING DIFFERENT ORGANS IN ABDOMINAL AREA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Q Medical International AG Kaltenbacherstrasse 24 8260 Stein am Rhein / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | For all designated states Q Medical International AG Kaltenbacherstasse 24 8260 Stein am Rhein / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Desombre, Rainer Grünstrasse 123 40667 Meerbusch / DE | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 19184510.6 | 04.07.2019 | [2021/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3760132 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/02, A61B8/08 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
A61B17/0218 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] |
Former [2021/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM HALTEN VON UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN ORGANEN IM ABDOMINALBEREICH | [2021/01] | English: | DEVICE FOR SUPPORTING DIFFERENT ORGANS IN ABDOMINAL AREA | [2021/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MAINTIEN DES DIFFÉRENTS ORGANES DANS LA ZONE ABDOMINALE | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 06.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/26] | 21.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO03096907 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US], et al) [X] 1,14 * figures 6A,6B,7A-7C * * page 12, line 10 - page 15, line 3 * [A] 2-10,13,15 [I] 11,12; | [XI]US2009137877 (MINNELLI PATRICK J [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6,8,13,14 * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0 48] - [0050] * [I] 5,10-12; | [XI]JP3049394B (KITANO HIROYA) [X] 1,8,14 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0012] - [0021] * [I] 10-12 |