EP3599315 - DRAIN COVER FOR A DRAINAGE FITTING FOR BATH AND/OR SHOWER TRAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, HR, RS | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viega Technology GmbH & Co. KG Viega Platz 1 57439 Attendorn / DE | [2020/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÖRKE, Daniel Schwesternhausweg 3 57368 Lennestadt / DE | 02 /
HENNES, Frank Serkenroder Strasse 91 57413 Finnentrop / DE | [2020/14] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2020/05] | Application number, filing date | 19185469.4 | 10.07.2019 | [2020/05] | Priority number, date | DE201820104241U | 24.07.2018 Original published format: DE 202018104241 U | [2020/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3599315 | Date: | 29.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3599315 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/22, E03F5/04 | [2020/05] | CPC: |
E03C1/22 (EP);
E03C2201/50 (EP);
E03F5/0408 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] |
Former [2020/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ABLAUFHAUBE FÜR EINE ABLAUFGARNITUR FÜR BADE- UND/ODER DUSCHWANNEN | [2020/05] | English: | DRAIN COVER FOR A DRAINAGE FITTING FOR BATH AND/OR SHOWER TRAYS | [2020/05] | French: | CAPOT D'ÉCOULEMENT POUR UNE GARNITURE D'ÉCOULEMENT POUR RECEVEURS DE BAIN ET / OU DE DOUCHE | [2020/05] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | 23.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 23.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application was refused due to failure to designate an inventor | 19.02.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 19.02.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.03.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.06.2024 | RS | 27.06.2024 | GR | 28.06.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | NO | 27.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2708893 (TIEFENBACH HERMANN DIPL ING DR) [A] 2,3,7,8* page 15, paragraph l; figure 5 *; | [XI]DE202005004101U (KALDEWEI FRANZ GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,4-6,9,10 * paragraphs [0008] , [0018] - paragraph [0024]; figure - * [I] 2,3,7,8; | [XI]DE102011000676 (KALDEWEI FRANZ GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,4,6,9 * paragraphs [0022] , [0025] , [0033] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-3c * [I] 2,3,5,7,8,10 | by applicant | EP2363543 |