EP3595197 - OPTICAL WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Vision 34,rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THIN, Guillaume Valeo Vision 34, rue Saint André 93012 BOBIGNY Cedex / FR | 02 /
DE LAMBERTERIE, Antoine VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint André 93012 BOBIGNY Cedex / FR | 03 /
AMIEL, François-Xavier 34, rue Saint André 93012 BOBIGNY Cedex / FR | 04 /
MBATA, Samira VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint André 93012 BOBIGNY Cedex / FR | 05 /
CANONNE, Thomas VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint André 93012 BOBIGNY Cedex / FR | 06 /
HOANG, Van-Thai VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint André 93012 BOBIGNY Cedex / FR | 07 /
DUBOIS, Vincent VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint André 93012 BOBIGNY Cedex / FR | 08 /
LEFAUDEUX, Nicolas VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint André 93012 BOBIGNY Cedex / FR | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | Valeo Visibility Service Propriété Industrielle c/o Valeo Vision 34, rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/03] | Valeo Vision IP Department 34, rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny / FR | Application number, filing date | 19185644.2 | 11.07.2019 | [2020/03] | Priority number, date | FR20180056390 | 11.07.2018 Original published format: FR 1856390 | [2020/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3595197 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/112, H04B10/116, H04B10/50, H04B10/67 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
H04B10/116 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04B10/1129 (CN);
H04B10/70 (US);
H04B10/1123 (EP);
H04B10/1143 (US);
H04B10/502 (EP,CN,KR);
H04B10/503 (KR);
H04B10/67 (EP);
H04B10/85 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/34] |
Former [2020/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHES DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2020/03] | English: | OPTICAL WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE | [2020/03] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL OPTIQUE POUR VÉHICULE | [2020/03] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/34] | 15.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/11] | 14.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.07.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 23.07.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.07.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]GB2499693 (L3 TRL TECHNOLOGY [GB]) [X] 1,2,4-7,12,13 * figures 1,6 * * page 1, lines 7-8 * * page 2, lines 20-40 * * page 3, lines 40-42 * * page 4, lines 1-2 * * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 1 * * page 7, lines 25-35 * * pages 30-42 * * page 12, lines 1-19 * [Y] 3 [I] 8,9,11; | [A]EP3098981 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [A] 9 * paragraph [0063] ** figure 1 *; | [XI]US2017186327 (UYSAL MURAT [TR], et al) [X] 1,7,10,14,15 * figures 3,4 * * paragraphs [0038] - [0040] * [I] 8,11; | [A]WO2018007385 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 * * abstract *; | [Y] - MARTIJN J.R. HECK, "Highly integrated optical phased arrays: photonic integrated circuits for optical beam shaping and beam steering", NANOPHOTONICS, (20160625), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1515/nanoph-2015-0152, ISSN 2192-8606, XP055455944 [Y] 3 * Introduction * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1515/nanoph-2015-0152 | [Y] - MEKHIEL CHRISTOPHER ET AL, "LED beam steering for Li-Fi communications", 2016 IEEE 21ST INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON COMPUTER AIDED MODELLING AND DESIGN OF COMMUNICATION LINKS AND NETWORKS (CAMAD), IEEE, (20161023), doi:10.1109/CAMAD.2016.7790364, pages 237 - 241, XP033035691 [Y] 3 * Introduction * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CAMAD.2016.7790364 |