EP3576032 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR REMINDING OF TASK AND CONTROLLING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WON, Sung-Joon Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu 16677 Suwon-si / KR | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/49] | HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19186027.9 | 10.07.2014 | [2019/49] | Priority number, date | KR20130082517 | 12.07.2013 Original published format: KR 20130082517 | [2019/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3576032 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10, G08B21/24 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
G06Q10/109 (EP,US);
G06F3/048 (KR);
G08B21/24 (US);
G06F9/46 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] |
Former [2019/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERINNERUNG AN EINE AUFGABE UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2019/49] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR REMINDING OF TASK AND CONTROLLING METHOD THEREOF | [2019/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE POUR FOURNIR UN RAPPEL DE TÂCHE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2019/49] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 10.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/42] | 13.03.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.05.2023 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/42] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14176620.4 / EP2824618 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011177830 (CLIPSHAM ANDREW CHARLES DRURY [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0062] *; | [I]US2012159341 (MURILLO OSCAR E [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0005] - [0010] - [0 19] - [0048] - [0 66] - [0089] *; | [X]WO2012167168 (APPLE INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0156] *; | [I]US2013115927 (GRUBER THOMAS ROBERT [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0200] * |