EP3574907 - A DUAL NK-1/NK-3 RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST FOR THE TREATMENT OF SEX-HORMONE-DEPENDENT DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/49] | AN NK-1/NK-3 RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST FOR THE TREATMENT OF SEX-HORMONE-DEPENDENT DISEASES | ||
[2023/10] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CZ, ES, RO, SK | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KaNDy Therapeutics Limited 400 South Oak Way Reading, Berkshire RG2 6AD / GB | [2021/24] |
Former [2019/49] | For all designated states NeRRe Therapeutics Limited Stevenage Bioscience Catalyst Office F25 Incubator Building Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage Herts SG1 2FX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TROWER, Mike P.O. Box c/o NeRRe Therapeutics Limited Stevenage Bioscience Catalyst Incubator Building, Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2FX / GB | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/34] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2019/49] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 19186140.0 | 16.05.2016 | [2019/49] | Priority number, date | US201562162870P | 18.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562162870 P | [2019/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3574907 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3574907 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/5383, A61K45/06, A61P5/24, A61P15/00, A61P15/02, A61P15/12, A61P43/00, A61K9/00 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
A61K31/5383 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/40 (US);
A61K31/436 (KR,US);
A61K31/4436 (KR,US);
A61K31/4439 (KR,US);
A61K31/444 (KR,US);
A61K31/5365 (KR,RU,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/00 (US);
A61P15/00 (EP,RU,US);
A61P15/02 (EP,US);
A61P15/12 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP,RU,US);
A61P5/24 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61P5/26 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] |
Former [2019/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EIN NK1/NK3-REZEPTORANTAGONIST ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GESCHLECHTSHORMONABHÄNGIGEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2023/13] | English: | A DUAL NK-1/NK-3 RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST FOR THE TREATMENT OF SEX-HORMONE-DEPENDENT DISEASES | [2023/10] | French: | UN ANTAGONISTE DES RÉCEPTEURS NK1/NK3 DESTINÉ AU TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES DÉPENDANTES DES HORMONES SEXUELLES | [2019/49] |
Former [2019/49] | EIN NK1/NK3-REZEPTORANTAGONIST ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GESCHLECHTSHORMONABHÄNGIGEN ERKRANKUNGEN | ||
Former [2019/49] | AN NK-1/NK-3 RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST FOR THE TREATMENT OF SEX-HORMONE-DEPENDENT DISEASES | Examination procedure | 02.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 02.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16723107.5 / EP3297631 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 23.08.2023 | |
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 23.08.2023 | |
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 23.11.2023 | |
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 23.11.2023 | |
GR | 24.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO02089802 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 20 - line 39 * * page 4, line 11 - page 6, line 27 * * page 9, line 25 - line 31 * * page 28, line 31 - page 31, line 36 * * claims 1-22 *; | [AD]WO2005002577 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * page 4, line 10 - line 13 * * page 105, Example 155 * * example 155 *; | [A]WO2005097774 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 5 - line 15 * * page 28, line 31 - page 29, line 2 * * page 64, Table 8, compound 8 * * claim 14 *; | [AD]WO2007028654 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * example 102 * * page 184, line 42 - page 185, line 17 * * claims 1-36 *; | [YD]WO2011023733 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC [US], et al) [YD] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 5 - line 19 * * page 2, line 205 - page 21 * * claims 1-13 *; | [A] - CATERINA BISSANTZ ET AL, "Identification of a Crucial Amino Acid in the Helix Position 6.51 of Human Tachykinin Neurokinin 1 and 3 Receptors Contributing to the Insurmountable Mode of Antagonism by Dual NK 1 /NK 3 Antagonists", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, US, (20120614), vol. 55, no. 11, doi:10.1021/jm2017072, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 5061 - 5076, XP055234123 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm2017072 | Examination | - DOMINIQUE DE ZIEGLER ET AL, "Inflammation and uterine fibrosis: the possible role of chronic endometritis", FERTILITY AND STERILITY, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20190501), vol. 111, no. 5, doi:10.1016/j.fertnstert.2019.02.005, ISSN 0015-0282, pages 890 - 891, XP055724527 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fertnstert.2019.02.005 | - Anon., "ICD-11 for Mortality and Morbidity Statistics : GA20.50 Heavy menstrual bleeding", (20190401), URL: https://icd.who.int/browse11/l-m/en#/http%3a%2f%2fid.who.int%2ficd%2fentity%2f609833590, (20230131), XP093019520 | by applicant | WO2004056799 | WO2004056805 | WO2005002577 | WO2005097794 | WO2006013050 | WO2007028654 | WO2008128891 | WO2011023733 | WO2011031571 | WO2011131571 | - BERTRANDGEPPETTI, Trends Pharmacol. Sci., (19960000), vol. 17, pages 255 - 259 | - Inactive Ingredient Guide, U.S. Food and Drug Administration (FDA) Center for Drug |