EP3594151 - CONTAINER FOR COLLECTING MATERIAL, AS WELL AS APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MANAGING A PLURALITY OF SUCH CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tesmapri SpA Via Bicchieraia 3 59013 Montemurlo / IT | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amerini, Edoardo Vicolo Sebastiano Venier 31100 Treviso / IT | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2020/03] | Application number, filing date | 19186156.6 | 12.07.2019 | [2020/03] | Priority number, date | IT20180007164 | 13.07.2018 Original published format: IT201800007164 | [2020/03] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3594151 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65F1/12, B65F1/14 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
B65F1/1426 (EP);
B65F2210/108 (EP);
B65F2210/128 (EP);
B65F2210/148 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER ZUM SAMMELN VON MATERIAL SOWIE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG EINER VIELZAHL SOLCHER BEHÄLTER | [2020/03] | English: | CONTAINER FOR COLLECTING MATERIAL, AS WELL AS APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MANAGING A PLURALITY OF SUCH CONTAINERS | [2020/03] | French: | RÉCIPIENT DE COLLECTE DE MATÉRIAU, AINSI QU'APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION D'UNE PLURALITÉ DE TELS RÉCIPIENTS | [2020/03] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/52] | 05.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2006016816 (BREMER DAVID J [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0134] - [0142]; figure - * [Y] 2-10; | [YA]US2017118609 (RODONI PHILIP [US]) [Y] 2-10 * the whole document *[A] 1 | by applicant | WO2014122630 | EP2937298 | EP3269667 |