EP3597901 - ROTOR BLADE FOR WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Winfoor AB Aldermansgatan 2 227 64 Lund / SE | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTHILSSON, Rikard Tulpangatan 10 244 60 Furulund / SE | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/04] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 19186253.1 | 23.09.2015 | [2020/04] | Priority number, date | SE20140051129 | 25.09.2014 Original published format: SE 1451129 | [2020/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3597901 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F03D1/06, F03D13/00 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
F03D1/0675 (EP,US);
F03D1/06 (EP,US);
F03D3/062 (EP,US);
F05B2240/221 (EP,US);
F05B2240/30 (EP,US);
F05B2240/302 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Title | German: | ROTORSCHAUFEL FÜR EINE WINDTURBINE | [2020/04] | English: | ROTOR BLADE FOR WIND TURBINE | [2020/04] | French: | PALE DE ROTOR POUR ÉOLIENNE | [2020/04] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/53] | 14.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/53] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15844905.8 / EP3198139 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2014056507 (UNIV AALBORG [DK]) [X] 1-3,5-11 * page 9, line 22 - page 10, line 20; figures 16, 17,25; claim 1 * [I] 4; | [XI]US4081221 (ANDREWS MERRITT B) [X] 1,3,5,6 * abstract * [I] 4 | by applicant | US7517198 | EP1887219 | US1820529 |