EP3766639 - HANDHELD MACHINE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2022 [2022/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geiger, Steffen Hogenbergstr. 13 80686 München / DE | 02 /
Wellmann Jelic, Andres Schlesierstr. 36 86899 Landsberg am Lech / DE | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2021/03] | Application number, filing date | 19186946.0 | 18.07.2019 | [2021/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3766639 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B25D17/04, B25F5/00 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
B25D17/043 (EP,US);
B25D17/24 (CN);
B25D11/00 (CN);
B25D17/04 (CN);
B25F5/006 (EP);
B25F5/02 (EP);
B25D2250/371 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HANDWERKZEUGMASCHINE | [2021/03] | English: | HANDHELD MACHINE TOOL | [2021/03] | French: | MACHINE-OUTIL MANUELLE | [2021/03] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/02] | 26.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH195398 (ROBERT WACKER FA [DE]); | [YA]US4576241 (EMONET HENRI [FR]); | [XAY]CN201711953U (BING BAI) |