EP3597866 - TURBINE SECTION FOR A GAS TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/04] | TURBINE VANE ASSEMBLY WITH CERAMIC MATRIX COMPOSITE COMPONENTS | ||
[2022/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce North American Technologies, Inc. 2059 S. Tibbs Avenue Indianapolis, IN 46241 / US | For all designated states Rolls-Royce Corporation 450 South Meridian Street Indianapolis, Indiana 46225 / US | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | [2020/09] |
Former [2020/04] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce North American Technologies, Inc. 2059 S. Tibbs Avenue Indianapolis, IN 46241 / US | ||
For all designated states Rolls-Royce Corporation 450 South Meridian Street Indianapolis, Indiana 46225 / US | |||
For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 62 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREEMAN, Ted J. 4541 Gibbs Road Danville, IN Indiana 46122 / US | 02 /
VETTERS, Daniel K. 648 Folcroft Court Indianapolis, IN Indiana 46234 / US | 03 /
NASH, Christopher 7534 Silverpine Ct Indianapolis, IN Indiana 46250 / US | 04 /
KOENIG, Eric 11281 Long Sotton Lane Fishers, IN Indiana 46037 / US | 05 /
WHITTLE, Michael Flat 36 Rutland House Derby, DE1 2NH / GB | [2020/07] |
Former [2020/04] | 01 /
FREEMAN, Ted J. 4541 Gibbs Road Danville, IN Indiana 46122 / US | ||
02 /
VETTERS, Daniel K. 648 Folcroft Court Indianapolis, IN Indiana 46234 / US | |||
03 /
NASH, Christopher 7070 Dover Road Indianapolis, IN Indiana 46220 / US | |||
04 /
KOENIG, Eric 11281 Long Sotton Lane Fishers, IN Indiana 46037 / US | |||
05 /
WHITTLE, Michael Flat 36 Rutland House Derby, DE1 2NH / GB | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/51] |
Former [2020/04] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 19187172.2 | 19.07.2019 | [2020/04] | Priority number, date | US201816041318 | 20.07.2018 Original published format: US201816041318 | [2020/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3597866 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3597866 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/04, F01D11/00, F01D11/02 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
F01D11/001 (EP);
F01D5/284 (US);
F01D11/005 (EP);
F01D11/02 (EP);
F01D11/08 (US);
F01D5/20 (US);
F01D5/3084 (US);
F01D9/042 (EP);
F01D17/162 (EP);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2240/55 (US);
F05D2260/31 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] |
Former [2020/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TURBINENSEKTION EINES GASTURBINENTRIEBWERKS | [2022/28] | English: | TURBINE SECTION FOR A GAS TURBINE ENGINE | [2022/28] | French: | SECTION DE TURBINE POUR MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ | [2022/28] |
Former [2020/04] | TURBINENSCHAUFELANORDNUNG MIT KERAMISCHEN MATRIXVERBUNDKOMPONENTEN | ||
Former [2020/04] | TURBINE VANE ASSEMBLY WITH CERAMIC MATRIX COMPOSITE COMPONENTS | ||
Former [2020/04] | ENSEMBLE D'AUBE DE TURBINE COMPRENANT DES COMPOSANTS COMPOSITES À MATRICE CÉRAMIQUE | Examination procedure | 02.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 02.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.12.2022 | AT | 21.12.2022 | CZ | 21.12.2022 | DK | 21.12.2022 | EE | 21.12.2022 | ES | 21.12.2022 | FI | 21.12.2022 | HR | 21.12.2022 | IT | 21.12.2022 | LT | 21.12.2022 | LV | 21.12.2022 | MC | 21.12.2022 | NL | 21.12.2022 | PL | 21.12.2022 | RO | 21.12.2022 | RS | 21.12.2022 | SE | 21.12.2022 | SI | 21.12.2022 | SK | 21.12.2022 | SM | 21.12.2022 | NO | 21.03.2023 | GR | 22.03.2023 | IS | 21.04.2023 | PT | 21.04.2023 | GB | 19.07.2023 | IE | 19.07.2023 | LU | 19.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
IT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
MC | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
GB | 19.07.2023 | ||
LU | 19.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
MC | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
GB | 19.07.2023 | ||
LU | 19.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
MC | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
LU | 19.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
MC | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 21.12.2022 | |
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 21.12.2022 | |
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 21.12.2022 | |
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 21.12.2022 | |
NO | 21.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5616001 (BOYD GARY L [US]) [Y] 15 * figure 3 *; | [Y]US8382432 (GRISSINO ALAN SCOTT [US], et al) [Y] 6-8,14 * figure 3 *; | [A]WO2014105270 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1, 2 ** paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] *; | [XAY]WO2014200831 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1,9,10,12,13 * figures 1, 3, 4 * * paragraph [00044] - paragraph [00049] * * paragraph [00051] - paragraph [00052] * * paragraph [00055] - paragraph [00057] * * paragraph [00062] - paragraph [00063] * [A] 4,11 [Y] 2,3,5-8,14,15; | [A]US2017101880 (THOMAS DAVID J [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0056] *; | [Y]US9970317 (FREEMAN TED J [US], et al) [Y] 2,3,5,15 * figures 1-4 * * column 4, line 13 - column 5, line 5 * * column 5, line 20 - column 5, line 64 * |