EP3587449 - PREVENTION OF INFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSL Behring AG Wankdorfstrasse 10 3014 Bern / CH | For all designated states Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, Inc. 330 Brookline Avenue Boston, MA 02215 / US | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kelly, Ciaran 308 Prince Street West Newton, MA 02465 / US | 02 /
Chen, Xinhua 260 Main Street No. 102 Malden, MA 02215 / US | 03 /
Miescher, Sylvia Hintere Engehaldenstrasse 76 3004 Bern / CH | 04 /
Spycher, Martin Rosengasse 22 3250 Lyss / CH | 05 /
Wymann, Sandra Innerer Giessenweg 4 3110 Muensingen / CH | 06 /
Zuercher, Adrian Stapfenackerstrasse 95 3018 Bern / CH | [2020/16] |
Former [2020/01] | 01 /
Kelly, Ciaran 308 Prince Street West Newton, MA 02465 / US | ||
02 /
Chen, Xinhua 260 Main Street No. 102 Malden, MA 02215 / US | |||
03 /
Miescher, Sylvia Hintere Engehaldenstrasse 76 3004 Bern / CH | |||
04 /
Spycher, Martin Rosengasse 22 3250 Lyss / CH | |||
05 /
Wymann, Sandra Stauffacherstrasse 30 3014 Bern / CH | |||
06 /
Zuercher, Adrian Stapfenackerstrasse 95 3018 Bern / CH | Representative(s) | Peter, Beate, et al CSL Behring GmbH Patents & Licenses Emil-von-Behring-Straße 76 35041 Marburg / DE | [2020/01] | Application number, filing date | 19187317.3 | 08.03.2013 | [2020/01] | Priority number, date | EP20120158933 | 09.03.2012 Original published format: EP 12158933 | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3587449 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/12, A61K38/14, A61K39/40, A61P31/04 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
C07K16/1282 (EP,US);
A61K38/14 (EP,US);
A61K38/1774 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (EP,US);
A61K39/40 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/395, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] |
Former [2020/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PRÄVENTION VON INFEKTIONEN | [2020/01] | English: | PREVENTION OF INFECTION | [2020/01] | French: | PRÉVENTION DES INFECTIONS | [2020/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 01.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/30] | 25.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/30] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13708787.0 / EP2822969 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008145420 (SIMON MICHAEL R [US]) [A] 1-23; | [XY]US2008260822 (SIMON MICHAEL R [US], et al) [X] 1-7,11-17,19-23 * paragraphs [0007] , [0 15] , [0 48] , [0 50]; claims 15, 18, 20 * [Y] 8-10,18; | [A] - PHALIPON A ET AL, "Novel functions of the polymeric Ig receptor: well beyond transport of immunoglobulins", TRENDS IN IMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, RAHWAY, NJ, US, (20030201), vol. 24, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S1471-4906(02)00031-5, ISSN 1471-4906, pages 55 - 58, XP004402384 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1471-4906(02)00031-5 | [Y] - DALLAS S D ET AL, "Binding of Clostridium difficile toxin A to human milk secretory component", JOURNAL OF MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (199810), vol. 47, no. 10, ISSN 0022-2615, pages 879 - 888, XP002681824 [Y] 1-23 * pages 884, 885, column left * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/00222615-47-10-879 | [A] - STUBBE H ET AL, "Polymeric IgA is superior to monomeric IgA and IgG carrying the same variable domain in preventing Clostridium difficile toxin A damaging of T84 monolayers", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, INC, US, (20000215), vol. 164, no. 4, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 1952 - 1960, XP009107500 [A] 1-23 | [Y] - LEIBL H ET AL, "Method for the isolation of biologically active monomeric immunoglobulin A from a plasma fraction", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, (19960412), vol. 678, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0378-4347(95)00501-3, ISSN 0378-4347, pages 173 - 180, XP004044044 [Y] 1-23 * page 173; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-4347(95)00501-3 | [A] - KABIR S ED - SANCHEZ ANA ET AL, "Jacalin: a jackfruit (Artocarpus heterophyllus) seed-derived lectin of versatile applications in immunobiological research", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980315), vol. 212, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0022-1759(98)00021-0, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 193 - 211, XP004129932 [A] 1-23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(98)00021-0 | [A] - HAUN M ET AL, "A rapid procedure for the purification of IgA"1 and IgA"2 subclasses from normal human serum using protein G and jackfruit lectin (jacalin) affinity chromatography", IMMUNOLOGY LETTERS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 22, no. 4, doi:10.1016/0165-2478(89)90165-X, ISSN 0165-2478, (19891001), pages 273 - 279, (19891001), XP023691958 [A] 1-23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-2478(89)90165-X | [A] - MANTIS NICHOLAS J ET AL, "Secretory IgA: Arresting Microbial Pathogens at Epithelial Borders", IMMUNOLOGICAL INVESTIGATIONS, INFORMA HEALTHCARE, US, (20100101), vol. 39, no. 4-5, doi:10.3109/08820131003622635, ISSN 0882-0139, pages 383 - 406, XP009161810 [A] 1-23 * page 386 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/08820131003622635 | by applicant | - KELLY, CPLAMONT, JT, N Engl J Med, (20080000), vol. 359, pages 1932 - 40 | - BARTLETT, JG et al., N Engl J Med, (19780000), vol. 298, pages 531 - 4 | - MILLER, BA et al., Infect Control Hosp Epidemiol, (20110000), vol. 32, pages 387 - 90 | - Int J Antimicrob Agents, (20090000), vol. 33, no. 1, pages 1 - 56 | - KUIJPER EJ et al., Clin Microbiol Infect, (20060000), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 2 - 18 | - SURAWICZ, CMALEXANDER, J., Nat Rev Gastroenterol Hepatol, (20110000), vol. 8, pages 330 - 9 | - LOWY, I. et al., N Engl J Med, (20100000), vol. 362, pages 197 - 205 | - PHALIPON A et al., Immunity, (20020000), vol. 17, pages 107 - 115 | - CHEN et al., Gastroenterology, (20080000), vol. 135, pages 1984 - 92 |