EP3611870 - HOMOMORPHIC KEY ENCODING FOR WHITE BOX IMPLEMENTATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus Building 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOS, Jopp Willem NXP Semiconductors, Intellectual Property Group High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
VERSLEGERS, Rudi NXP Semiconductors, Intellectual Property Group High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
MICHIELS, Wilhelmus Petrus Adrianus Johannus NXP Semiconductors, Intellectual Property Group High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/08] | Representative(s) | Krott, Michel NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/08] | Application number, filing date | 19187359.5 | 19.07.2019 | [2020/08] | Priority number, date | US201816050350 | 31.07.2018 Original published format: US201816050350 | [2020/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3611870 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00, H04W12/04 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
H04L9/003 (EP);
H04L9/0861 (US);
H04L9/008 (EP,US);
H04L9/0618 (US);
H04L9/14 (US);
H04L9/3242 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] |
Former [2020/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOMOMORPHE SCHLÜSSELKODIERUNG FÜR "WHITE BOX" IMPLEMENTIERUNGEN | [2020/08] | English: | HOMOMORPHIC KEY ENCODING FOR WHITE BOX IMPLEMENTATIONS | [2020/08] | French: | ENCODAGE DE CLEFS HOMOMORPHIQUE POUR DES IMPLEMENTATIONS EN BOITE BLANCHE | [2020/08] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 19.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.10.2021 | 15.09.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.11.2021 | 24.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/06] | 04.10.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/06] | 12.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]EP3264316 (NXP BV [NL]) [I] 1-7 * the whole document * [A] 8-15; | [IA] - Denis Kolegov ET AL, "GitHub - tsu-iscd/jcrypto", Github, (20171121), URL: https://github.com/tsu-iscd/jcrypto, (20191212), XP055652456 [I] 8-15 * the whole document * [A] 1-7 | [A] - JAMES A MUIR, "A Tutorial on White-box AES", IACR, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR CRYPTOLOGIC RESEARCH, (20130228), vol. 20130228:053134, pages 1 - 25, XP061007352 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | - "White-box cryptography and an AES implementation, Selected Areas in Cryptography - SAC 2002", STANLEY CHOWPHILIP A. EISENHAROLD JOHNSONPAUL C. VAN OORSCHOT, Lecture Notes in Computer Science, Springer, (20030000), vol. 2696, pages 250 - 270 |