EP3640077 - VEHICLE, DETERIORATION EVALUATION DEVICE FOR SECONDARY BATTERY, AND DETERIORATION EVALUATION METHOD FOR SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471 8571 / JP | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUBO, Kazuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
UCHIDA, Yoshihiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
IZUMI, Junta c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
UCHIYAMA, Masaki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2020/17] | Application number, filing date | 19189006.0 | 30.07.2019 | [2020/17] | Priority number, date | JP20180197633 | 19.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018197633 | [2020/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3640077 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60L3/00, B60L58/16 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
B60L58/16 (EP,CN);
B60L3/0046 (EP,CN);
H01M10/488 (EP,CN,US);
B60L3/12 (CN);
B60L58/12 (CN,US);
G01R31/3646 (US);
G01R31/392 (US);
B60K6/28 (US);
B60L2250/16 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUG, VERSCHLECHTERUNGSAUSWERTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR SEKUNDÄRE BATTERIE UND VERSCHLECHTERUNGSAUSWERTUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR SEKUNDÄRE BATTERIE | [2020/17] | English: | VEHICLE, DETERIORATION EVALUATION DEVICE FOR SECONDARY BATTERY, AND DETERIORATION EVALUATION METHOD FOR SECONDARY BATTERY | [2020/17] | French: | VÉHICULE, DISPOSITIF D'ÉVALUATION DE LA DÉTÉRIORATION POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION DE LA DÉTÉRIORATION D'UNE BATTERIE SECONDAIRE | [2020/17] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2019 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 31.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102005026583 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023] * * figures 2A-4C *; | [A]US2013096858 (AMANO MASAMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0065] ** paragraph [0083] *; | [Y]US2014032102 (EGOSHI YASUO [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0062] * * figures 3,4 *; | [Y]US2015188198 (BONHOMME FREDERIC C [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0080] * | by applicant | JP2018029430 |