EP3604642 - TEXTILE MACHINE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A TEXTILE MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rieter AG Klosterstrasse 20 8406 Winterthur / CH | [2024/34] |
Former [2020/06] | For all designated states Maschinenfabrik Rieter AG Klosterstrasse 20 8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEPHAN, Adalbert Am Haar 23 92339 Beilngries/Paulushofen / DE | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Despag-Straße 6 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [2024/10] |
Former [2020/06] | Baudler, Ron Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Friedrich-Ebert-Straße 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 19189624.0 | 01.08.2019 | [2020/06] | Priority number, date | DE201810118654 | 01.08.2018 Original published format: DE102018118654 | [2020/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3604642 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3604642 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | D01H1/20, B65H54/00, D01H4/42 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
D01H1/20 (EP,US);
B65H63/00 (EP,CN,US);
B65H54/06 (CN);
B65H54/26 (EP);
B65H54/74 (EP);
B65H67/0405 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] |
Former [2020/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER TEXTILMASCHINE UND TEXTILMASCHINE | [2020/06] | English: | TEXTILE MACHINE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A TEXTILE MACHINE | [2020/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE MACHINE TEXTILE ET MACHINE TEXTILE | [2020/06] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 22.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 06.03.2024 | ES | 06.03.2024 | FI | 06.03.2024 | HR | 06.03.2024 | LT | 06.03.2024 | LV | 06.03.2024 | NL | 06.03.2024 | SE | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
SE | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 06.03.2024 | |
NO | 06.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102007043417 (RIETER INGOLSTADT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * figure 1 *; | [XY]DE102013111647 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [X] 1,9-11 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0021] * * figure 1 * [Y] 2-8; | [Y]EP3144418 (SAURER GERMANY GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 5 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0026] ** figures 1-7 *; | [Y]EP3168179 (SAURER GERMANY GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 2,3,6-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0025] * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE102016106107 |