EP3780291 - LOW PASSIVE INTERMODULATION CONNECTOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spinner GmbH Erzgiessereistrasse 33 80335 München / DE | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niebauer, Robert Deggendorfer Str. 16 83098 Brannenburg / DE | 02 /
Zissler, Wolfgang Porschenweg 3 83620 Feldkirchen Westerham / DE | 03 /
Neumaier, Christoph Antholing, Glonner Str.6 85625 Baiern / DE | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Lohr, Jöstingmeier & Partner Junkersstraße 3 82178 Puchheim/München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19191158.5 | 12.08.2019 | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3780291 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01R24/44, H01R13/629 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
H01R24/44 (EP,CN);
H01R24/40 (US);
H01R13/17 (US);
H01R13/629 (EP,CN,US);
H01R2103/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STECKVERBINDERSYSTEM MIT NIEDRIGER PASSIVER INTERMODULATION | [2021/07] | English: | LOW PASSIVE INTERMODULATION CONNECTOR SYSTEM | [2021/07] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CONNECTEUR À FAIBLE INTERMODULATION PASSIVE | [2021/07] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/06] | 23.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011130048 (HAUNBERGER THOMAS [DE], et al); | [X]US2015229070 (VAN SWEARINGEN KENDRICK [US]); | [XY]EP3061162 (COMMSCOPE TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]); | [A]EP3300535 (SPINNER GMBH ELEKTROTECH [DE]) | by applicant | US9236694 |